EP3194476 - FILM WITH MODERATE CROSSLINKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.02.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Borealis AG IZD Tower Wagramerstraße 17-19 1220 Vienna / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2017/30] | For all designated states Borealis AG IZD Tower Wagramerstraße 17-19 1220 Vienna / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COSTA, Francis Fröhlerweg 39 Top 8/4 A-4040 Linz / AT | 02 /
BERGQVIST, Mattias Borealis AB S-444 86 Stenungsund / SE | 03 /
HELLSTRÖM, Stefan Borealis AB Olserödsgatan 40 S-44242 Kungälv / SE | 04 /
BROEDERS, Bert Vlierbesstraat 4 B-3580 Beringen / BE | 05 /
GALGALI, Girish Suresh Borealis Polyolefine GmbH A-4021 Linz / AT | 06 /
PIEL, Tanja Andromedastrasse 26 A-4030 Linz / AT | 07 /
SULTAN, Bernt-Ake Söbackevägen 16 S-44442 Stenungsund / SE | 08 /
VERHEULE, Bart Fr. Cretenlaan 5 B-2627 Schelle / BE | 09 /
ODERKERK, Jeroen Pressarevägen 28 S-44452 Stenungsund / SE | [2018/28] |
Former [2018/25] | 01 /
COSTA, Francis Fröhlerweg 39 Top 8/4 A-4040 Linz / AT | ||
02 /
BERGQVIST, Mattias Borealis AB S-444 86 Stenungsund / SE | |||
03 /
HELLSTRÖM, Stefan Borealis AB Olserödsgatan 40 S-44242 Kungälv / SE | |||
04 /
BROEDERS, Bert Vlierbesstraat 4 B-3580 Beringen / BE | |||
05 /
GALGALI, Girish Suresh Ferdinand Marklstrasse 15/5 A-4040 Linz / AT | |||
06 /
PIEL, Tanja Andromedastrasse 26 A-4030 Linz / AT | |||
07 /
SULTAN, Bernt-Ake Söbackevägen 16 S-44442 Stenungsund / SE | |||
08 /
VERHEULE, Bart Fr. Cretenlaan 5 B-2627 Schelle / BE | |||
09 /
ODERKERK, Jeroen Pressarevägen 28 S-44452 Stenungsund / SE | |||
Former [2017/30] | 01 /
COSTA, Francis Fröhlerweg 39 Top 8/4 A-4040 Linz / AT | ||
02 /
BERGQVIST, Mattias Ulveliden 13 S-41674 Göteborg / SE | |||
03 /
HELLSTRÖM, Stefan Borealis AB Olserödsgatan 40 S-44242 Kungälv / SE | |||
04 /
BROEDERS, Bert Vlierbesstraat 4 B-3580 Beringen / BE | |||
05 /
GALGALI, Girish Suresh Ferdinand Marklstrasse 15/5 A-4040 Linz / AT | |||
06 /
PIEL, Tanja Andromedastrasse 26 A-4030 Linz / AT | |||
07 /
SULTAN, Bernt-Ake Söbackevägen 16 S-44442 Stenungsund / SE | |||
08 /
VERHEULE, Bart Fr. Cretenlaan 5 B-2627 Schelle / BE | |||
09 /
ODERKERK, Jeroen Pressarevägen 28 S-44452 Stenungsund / SE | Representative(s) | Zumstein, Angela Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/24] | Zumstein, Angela Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2017/30] | Zumstein, Angela Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15763015.3 | 15.09.2015 | [2017/30] | WO2015EP71072 | Priority number, date | EP20140185403 | 18.09.2014 Original published format: EP 14185403 | [2017/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016041946 | Date: | 24.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3194476 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3194476 | Date: | 13.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/18, C08L51/06 | [2017/30] | CPC: |
C08J5/18 (EP,CN,US);
B32B17/10 (EP,US);
B32B17/1055 (EP,US);
B32B27/18 (US);
C08K5/005 (EP,CN,US);
C08K5/3432 (EP,CN,US);
C08K5/3435 (EP,CN,US);
C08K5/3492 (EP,CN,US);
C08K5/34926 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08K5/005, C08L23/0892 (CN);
C08K5/005, C08L51/06 (US,EP);
C08K5/3432, C08L23/0892 (CN);
C08K5/3432, C08L51/06 (US,EP);
C08K5/3435, C08L23/0892 (CN);
C08K5/3435, C08L51/06 (EP,US);
C08K5/3492, C08L23/0892 (CN);
C08K5/3492, C08L51/06 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FILM MIT GERINGER VERNETZUNG | [2017/30] | English: | FILM WITH MODERATE CROSSLINKING | [2017/30] | French: | FILM À RÉTICULATION MODÉRÉE | [2017/30] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/30] | 12.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.09.2015 | AL | 13.06.2018 | AT | 13.06.2018 | CY | 13.06.2018 | CZ | 13.06.2018 | DK | 13.06.2018 | EE | 13.06.2018 | FI | 13.06.2018 | HR | 13.06.2018 | LT | 13.06.2018 | LV | 13.06.2018 | MC | 13.06.2018 | MK | 13.06.2018 | NL | 13.06.2018 | PL | 13.06.2018 | PT | 13.06.2018 | RO | 13.06.2018 | RS | 13.06.2018 | SE | 13.06.2018 | SK | 13.06.2018 | SM | 13.06.2018 | BG | 13.09.2018 | NO | 13.09.2018 | GR | 14.09.2018 | IE | 15.09.2018 | LU | 15.09.2018 | MT | 15.09.2018 | SI | 15.09.2018 | CH | 30.09.2018 | LI | 30.09.2018 | IS | 13.10.2018 | [2021/01] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 15.09.2015 | |
AL | 13.06.2018 | ||
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
MK | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PT | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IE | 15.09.2018 | ||
LU | 15.09.2018 | ||
MT | 15.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 15.09.2015 | |
AL | 13.06.2018 | ||
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PT | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IE | 15.09.2018 | ||
LU | 15.09.2018 | ||
MT | 15.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 13.06.2018 | |
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PT | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IE | 15.09.2018 | ||
LU | 15.09.2018 | ||
MT | 15.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 13.06.2018 | |
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IE | 15.09.2018 | ||
LU | 15.09.2018 | ||
MT | 15.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 13.06.2018 | |
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IE | 15.09.2018 | ||
LU | 15.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IE | 15.09.2018 | ||
LU | 15.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IE | 15.09.2018 | ||
LU | 15.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
LU | 15.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 13.06.2018 | |
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO9724023 (SCHOMBOURG JACQUES [CH], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * pages 7,13 * [A] 2-15; | [XA]WO2010000479 (DOW CORNING [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0077] , [0097] * [A] 2-15; | [X]EP2144301 (BOREALIS AG [AT]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [I]EP2251365 (BOREALIS AG [AT]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0095] *; | [XA]JP2012094845 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0050] * [A] 2-15; | [XA]JP5130452B (UNION CARBIDE CHEM & PLASTICS CO INC) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-15; | [X]WO2013159942 (BOREALIS AG [AT]) [X] 1* abstract * |