EP3158204 - RADIAL COMPRESSOR IMPELLER AND ASSOCIATED RADIAL COMPRESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2017/17] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JONEN, Werner Fuldastrasse 12 47051 Duisburg / DE | [2017/17] | Application number, filing date | 15763593.9 | 16.09.2015 | [2017/17] | WO2015EP71174 | Priority number, date | DE201410219058 | 22.09.2014 Original published format: DE102014219058 | [2017/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016046036 | Date: | 31.03.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3158204 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/28, F04D29/30 | [2017/17] | CPC: |
F04D29/30 (EP,US);
F04D17/10 (US);
F04D29/284 (EP,US);
F05D2240/304 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/17] | Title | German: | RADIALVERDICHTERLAUFRAD UND ZUGEHÖRIGER RADIALVERDICHTER | [2017/17] | English: | RADIAL COMPRESSOR IMPELLER AND ASSOCIATED RADIAL COMPRESSOR | [2017/17] | French: | ROTOR DE COMPRESSEUR RADIAL ET COMPRESSEUR RADIAL ASSOCIÉ | [2017/17] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/17] | 23.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 28.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US3145915 (FIRMIN MARCHAL RAYMOND HIPPOLY, et al) [X] 1,11 * column 3, lines 20-22 * [I] 2-10; | [XI]EP2213881 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1,11 * paragraph [0025]; figure 1 * [I] 2-10; | [XI]WO2010128153 (NUOVO PIGNONE SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1,11 * abstract * [I] 2-10 |