EP3202240 - SMART TEXTILE PRODUCT AND METHOD FOR FABRICATING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMEC vzw Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | For all designated states Universiteit Gent Sint-Pietersnieuwstraat 25 9000 Gent / BE | [2024/21] |
Former [2017/32] | For all designated states IMEC vzw Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | ||
For all designated states Universiteit Gent Sint-Pietersnieuwstraat 25 9000 Gent / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN KEYMEULEN, Bjorn c/o IMEC Patent Department Kapeldreef 75 B-3001 Leuven / BE | [2024/16] |
Former [2017/32] | 01 /
VAN KEYMEULEN, Bjorn MEC Patent Department Kapeldreef 75 B-3001 Leuven / BE | Representative(s) | Gevers Patents De Kleetlaan 7A 1831 Diegem / BE | [2024/16] |
Former [2017/32] | Gevers Patents Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 15763612.7 | 17.09.2015 | [2017/32] | WO2015EP71295 | Priority number, date | EP20140186909 | 29.09.2014 Original published format: EP 14186909 | [2017/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016050525 | Date: | 07.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3202240 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3202240 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/28, H05K1/03 | [2017/32] | CPC: |
H05K1/038 (EP,US);
H05K1/0283 (US);
H05K1/111 (US);
H05K1/181 (US);
H05K3/284 (EP,US);
H05K3/32 (US);
H05K2201/0133 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0281 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10977 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTELLIGENTES TEXTILPRODUKT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2017/32] | English: | SMART TEXTILE PRODUCT AND METHOD FOR FABRICATING THE SAME | [2017/32] | French: | PRODUIT TEXTILE INTELLIGENT ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2017/32] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/32] | 06.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 17.04.2024 | [2024/44] | Cited in | International search | [XI]GB2396252 (LEFTLY STEVEN [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,9,13 * the whole document * [I] 5,8,10-12,14-25; | [XI]US2005029680 (JUNG STEFAN [DE], et al) [X] 1-6,8,13 * paragraphs [0038] , [0 41] - [0043] - [0 45]; figures 4, 6 * [I] 7,9,14-25; | [A]US2006035554 (GLASER RUPERT H J [DE], et al) [A] 1-25* paragraphs [0063] - [0069]; figure 1 * |