EP3169973 - MOBILE UNIT FOR MEASURING RUNNING PATHS FOR HANDLING MEANS, SYSTEM AND PROCESS FOR MEASURING THROUGH SUCH MOBILE UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Politecnico Di Torino Corso Duca degli Abruzzi 24 10129 Torino / IT | For all designated states Hexagon Metrology S.p.A. Via Vittime di Piazza della Loggia, 6 10024 Moncalieri / IT | For all designated states Cerrato S.r.l. Via Manzoni 8 10092 Beinasco (TO) / IT | [2017/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOMA, Aurelio c/o Politecnico de Torino Corso Duca degli Abruzzi 1019 Torino / IT | 02 /
BOSSO, Nicola c/o Politecnico de Torino Corso Duca degli Abruzzi 1019 Torino / IT | 03 /
DE PASQUALE, Giorgio c/o Politecnico de Torino Corso Duca degli Abruzzi 1019 Torino / IT | 04 /
CERRATO, Dario c/o Cerrato S.R.L. Via Manzoni 8 10092 Beinasco (TO) / IT | 05 /
CERRATO, Michele c/o Hexagon Metrology S.P.A. Via Vittime di Piazza della Loggia 6 10024 Moncalieri (TO) / IT | 06 /
CASSANI, Cesare c/o Hexagon Metrology S.P.A. Via Vittime di Piazza della Loggia 6 10024 Moncalieri (TO) / IT | 07 /
VERDI, Michele c/o Hexagon Metrology S.P.A. Via Vittime di Piazza della Loggia 6 10024 Moncalieri (TO) / IT | [2017/21] | Representative(s) | Garavelli, Paolo A.BRE.MAR. S.R.L. Consulenza in Proprietà Industriale Via Servais 27 10146 Torino / IT | [2017/21] | Application number, filing date | 15763652.3 | 07.07.2015 | [2017/21] | WO2015IT00176 | Priority number, date | IT2014TO00564 | 16.07.2014 Original published format: IT TO20140564 | [2017/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016009457 | Date: | 21.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3169973 | Date: | 24.05.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01C7/04, B66C7/08, B66C9/16, B66C15/00 | [2017/21] | CPC: |
B66C7/08 (EP,US);
G01B11/26 (US);
B66C15/00 (EP,US);
B66C9/16 (EP,US);
G01C7/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/21] | Title | German: | MOBILE EINHEIT ZUR MESSUNG VON LAUFWEGEN FÜR ABWICKLUNGSMITTEL, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG DURCH DIESE MOBILE EINHEIT | [2017/21] | English: | MOBILE UNIT FOR MEASURING RUNNING PATHS FOR HANDLING MEANS, SYSTEM AND PROCESS FOR MEASURING THROUGH SUCH MOBILE UNIT | [2017/21] | French: | UNITÉ MOBILE DE MESURE DE CHEMINS DE PARCOURS POUR DES MOYENS DE MANIPULATION, SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE PAR L'INTERMÉDIAIRE D'UNE TELLE UNITÉ MOBILE | [2017/21] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/21] | 17.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/46] | 02.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2020 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2831916 (KRUPP GMBH) [A] 1,9 * page 10, line 1 - page 11, line 8; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DD212931 (BAUAKADEMIE DDR [DD]) [A] 1,2,9 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 4 - page 5, line 3; figure .; claims 1-3 *; | [A]DE19906771 (SEIBERT DANIEL [DE], et al) [A] 1,9 * column 5, line 23 - column 8, line 13; figures 1-6; claims 1-20 *; | [AD]WO2011058212 (KONECRANES PLC [FI], et al) [AD] 2* abstract * | by applicant | WO2011058212 |