EP3120871 - SOLID DISPERSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.09.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): EE, PL, PT, RO | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP | [2023/25] |
Former [2017/04] | For all designated states Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited 1-1 Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOMURA, Yukihiro c/o TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED 17-85 Jusohonmachi 2-chome Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 532-0024 / JP | 02 /
TSUSHIMA, Yuki c/o TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED 17-85 Jusohonmachi 2-chome Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 532-0024 / JP | 03 /
EBISAWA, Yutaka c/o TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED 17-85 Jusohonmachi 2-chome Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 532-0024 / JP | [2017/04] | Representative(s) | Jones, Nicholas Andrew Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2023/26] |
Former [2017/04] | Jones, Nicholas Andrew Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London, SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 15764152.3 | 17.03.2015 | [2017/04] | WO2015JP57855 | Priority number, date | JP20140055543 | 18.03.2014 Original published format: JP 2014055543 | [2017/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015141662 | Date: | 24.09.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3120871 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3120871 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.09.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/38, A61K9/14, A61K47/32, A61K31/4422, A61P9/12, A61P25/18, A61P43/00 | [2021/37] | CPC: |
A61K9/146 (EP,US);
A61K31/4422 (EP,US);
A61K31/501 (EP,US);
A61K9/145 (EP,US);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
B01J2/22 (US);
B29B9/10 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/42] | A61K47/38, A61K9/14, A61K47/32, A61K31/4422 | ||
Former IPC [2017/04] | A61K47/38, A61K9/22, A61K47/12, A61K47/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FESTSTOFFDISPERSION | [2017/04] | English: | SOLID DISPERSION | [2017/04] | French: | DISPERSION SOLIDE | [2017/04] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2016 | Translation filed | 16.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2016 | Search fee paid | 16.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/04] | 16.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 26.09.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 30.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 26.09.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 26.09.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.10.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.06.2023 | CZ | 28.06.2023 | EE | 28.06.2023 | ES | 28.06.2023 | FI | 28.06.2023 | HR | 28.06.2023 | LT | 28.06.2023 | LV | 28.06.2023 | NL | 28.06.2023 | PL | 28.06.2023 | RO | 28.06.2023 | RS | 28.06.2023 | SE | 28.06.2023 | SK | 28.06.2023 | SM | 28.06.2023 | NO | 28.09.2023 | GR | 29.09.2023 | IS | 28.10.2023 | PT | 30.10.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2024/09] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 28.06.2023 | |
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 28.06.2023 | |
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | SE | 28.06.2023 | |
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | SE | 28.06.2023 | |
NO | 28.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5456923 (NAKAMICHI KOUICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-13 * column 1, line 8 - line 13 * * column 2, line 32 - line 59 * * examples 1-4 * * claims 1-10 *; | [Y]EP1350792 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-13 * paragraph [0189] - paragraph [0191] * * examples 2,3,7 * * claim 1 *; | [Y]WO2007027494 (SANOFI AVENTIS US LLC [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * claims 1-6 *; | [Y]EP1967181 (ESTEVE LABOR DR [ES]) [Y] 1-13 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0020] * * example 6 * * claims 1-14 *; | [Y]US2009053315 (BROUGH CHRIS [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * paragraph [0067] * * example 5 * * claims 1-15 *; | [A]US2010197651 (TANIGUCHI TAKAHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [1288] * * example 120 * * paragraph [2571] - paragraph [2572] ** claim 33 *; | [Y]US2011306632 (MILLER JONATHAN M [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0145] - paragraph [0183] * * claims 1-3 *; | [Y]US2013142877 (NALAWADE PRAVIN [IN], et al) [Y] 1-13 * examples 1-8 * * claims 1-14 *; | [E]WO2015103230 (ASCENDIA PHARMACEUTICALS LLC [US]) [E] 1,11,13 * claims 1-16 * | International search | [XY]JP2004067606 (ZENSEI YAKUHIN KOGYO KK) [X] 1-4, 8, 13 * , claims 1 to 12; paragraphs [0009], [0010], [0013]; examples 1 to 13 (Family: none) * [Y] 1-13; | [Y]JP2004534822 (Pfizer Products Inc.) [Y] 1-13 * , claims 1 to 15; paragraph [0058]; examples 1 to 17 & US 2003/0054038 A1 & WO 2003/000292 A1 & EP 1399190 A *; | [Y]JP2010502645 (Eurand, Inc.) [Y] 1-13 * , claims 1 to 8; paragraph [0049] & US 2008/0069878 A1 & WO 2008/027993 A2 & EP 2056792 A *; | [Y] - NIKGHALB, L.A. et al., "Solid Dispersion: Methods and Polymers to increase the solubility of poorly soluble drugs", Journal of Applied Pharmaceutical Science, (20120000), vol. 2, no. 10, pages 170 - 175, XP055225167 [Y] 1-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.7324/JAPS.2012.21031 | [Y] - TRAN, T.TD. et al., "The roles of acidifiers in solid dispersions and physical mixtures", International Journal of Pharmaceutics, (20100000), vol. 384, pages 60 - 66, XP026790369 [Y] 1-13 | [Y] - MOGAL, S.A. et al., "Solid dispersion technique for improving solubility of some poorly soluble drugs", Der Pharmacia Lettre, (20120000), vol. 4, no. 5, pages 1574 - 1586, XP055225173 [Y] 1-13 | Examination | EP0580860 | US2015182457 |