EP3121545 - HEAT EXCHANGER AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2019/21] |
Former [2017/04] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEONG, Young Min 19 Nohae-ro 70-gil Dobong-gu Seoul 132-901 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Soo Young 39 Dongbaekpyeongchon-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-723 / KR | 03 /
KIL, Seong Ho 361 Buljeong-ro Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-765 / KR | 04 /
JUNG, Moon Il 33-7 Gwongwang-ro 276beon-gil Paldal-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-828 / KR | [2017/04] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2017/04] | Application number, filing date | 15764496.4 | 17.03.2015 | [2017/04] | WO2015KR02568 | Priority number, date | KR20140032198 | 19.03.2014 Original published format: KR 20140032198 | [2017/04] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015142028 | Date: | 24.09.2015 | Language: | KO | [2015/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3121545 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3121545 | Date: | 22.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.09.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F28D1/053, F28F1/00, F28F9/02, F28F21/06 | [2017/04] | CPC: |
F28D1/05391 (EP,US);
B23P15/26 (US);
B29C45/14598 (EP,US);
B29C45/14614 (EP,US);
B29C45/2602 (US);
B29C45/261 (US);
B29C45/2628 (US);
B29C45/33 (US);
F28F1/00 (EP,US);
F28F1/24 (EP,US);
F28F1/36 (EP,US);
F28F21/062 (EP,US);
F28F21/067 (EP,US);
F28F21/085 (EP,US);
F28F9/02 (EP,US);
F28F9/0224 (EP,US);
F28F9/0226 (US);
F28F9/16 (EP,US);
F28F9/262 (EP,US);
B29K2105/258 (US);
B29K2705/10 (US);
B29L2031/18 (US);
F28D2021/0061 (EP,US);
F28D2021/007 (US);
F28D2021/0071 (US);
F28F1/26 (EP,US);
F28F1/34 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMETAUSCHER UND VERFAHREN ZU HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2017/04] | English: | HEAT EXCHANGER AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2017/04] | French: | ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2017/04] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2016 | Translation filed | 16.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2016 | Search fee paid | 16.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/04] | 16.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.03.2015 | AL | 22.05.2019 | AT | 22.05.2019 | CY | 22.05.2019 | CZ | 22.05.2019 | DK | 22.05.2019 | EE | 22.05.2019 | ES | 22.05.2019 | FI | 22.05.2019 | HR | 22.05.2019 | IT | 22.05.2019 | LT | 22.05.2019 | LV | 22.05.2019 | MC | 22.05.2019 | MK | 22.05.2019 | MT | 22.05.2019 | NL | 22.05.2019 | PL | 22.05.2019 | RO | 22.05.2019 | RS | 22.05.2019 | SE | 22.05.2019 | SI | 22.05.2019 | SK | 22.05.2019 | SM | 22.05.2019 | TR | 22.05.2019 | BG | 22.08.2019 | NO | 22.08.2019 | GR | 23.08.2019 | IS | 22.09.2019 | PT | 22.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 17.03.2015 | |
AL | 22.05.2019 | ||
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CY | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
MT | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
IS | 22.09.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2022/28] | HU | 17.03.2015 | |
AL | 22.05.2019 | ||
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CY | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
MT | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 22.05.2019 | |
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 22.05.2019 | |
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US4923004 (FLETCHER ELDON L [CA], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 4, line 56 - line 59 * * column 7, line 55 - line 57 * [Y] 7 [I] 8-15; | [X]JPS58178194 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1 * figure 2 *; | [X]US2008121387 (TANIGUCHI MITSUNORI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * figure 12 *; | [Y]EP0191956 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 7 * figure 7 *; | [A]WO2008018712 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR], et al) [A] 8-15 * abstract *; | [A]US2003116309 (DISPENZA JOHN A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 9 * | International search | [YA]US4923004 (FLETCHER et al.) [Y] 1-3, 21-23,33-35 * See abstract, column 6, lines 42-46, claim 6 and figure 5. * [A] 4-20,24-32; | [Y]KR100513008B (LG ELECTRONICS INC.) [Y] 4-8,15-18,25-32 * See page 3, line 37, claim 1 and figures 5-7. *; | [Y]KR100854572B (LG CHEM, LTD.) [Y] 8,15-20,28,30-32 * See paragraphs [0027], [0035]-[0036] and figures 6-7. *; | [Y]KR19990001084 (LG ELECTRONICS INC.) [Y] 9-14,24,27 * See page 2, lines 37-38, claims 1-2, 4 and figures 2-3, 5. *; | [A]JP2008304108 (CALSONIC KANSEI CORP.) [A] 1-35 * See abstract, paragraphs [0023]-[0024] and figures 1-4. * | Examination | EP0305702 |