EP3120465 - SIGNALLING FOR COORDINATED MULTI-POINT TRANSMISSION AND RECEPTION (CoMP) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2017/04] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRASAD, Narayan 625-2 8470 Limekiln Pike Wyncote, Pennsylvania 19095 / US | 02 /
KHOJASTEPOUR, Mohammad 17 Port Mercer Road Lawrenceville, New Jersey 08648 / US | 03 /
ARSLAN, Mustafa 110 Lowell Court Princeton, New Jersey 08540 / US | 04 /
SUNDARESAN, Karthikeyan 245 Larchwood Court Howell, New Jersey 07731 / US | 05 /
RANGARAJAN, Sampath 40 Linberger Drive Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | [2017/04] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2017/04] | Application number, filing date | 15765463.3 | 19.03.2015 | [2017/04] | WO2015US21372 | Priority number, date | US201461955559P | 19.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461955559 P | US201461991323P | 09.05.2014 Original published format: US 201461991323 P | US201461991055P | 09.05.2014 Original published format: US 201461991055 P | US201462034724P | 07.08.2014 Original published format: US 201462034724 P | US201462034885P | 08.08.2014 Original published format: US 201462034885 P | US201462055381P | 25.09.2014 Original published format: US 201462055381 P | US201462056095P | 26.09.2014 Original published format: US 201462056095 P | US201514661236 | 18.03.2015 Original published format: US201514661236 | [2017/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015143101 | Date: | 24.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3120465 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.09.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04B17/309, H04B7/024, // H04W72/08, H04W72/04, H04B7/06 | [2017/49] | CPC: |
H04B7/0417 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/024 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/20 (KR,US);
H04B17/318 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/0626 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/0053 (KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/04] | H04B7/02, H04B17/318 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/04] | Title | German: | SIGNALISIERUNG FÜR KOORDINIERTES MEHRPUNKT-SENDEN UND -EMPFANGEN | [2017/04] | English: | SIGNALLING FOR COORDINATED MULTI-POINT TRANSMISSION AND RECEPTION (CoMP) | [2017/04] | French: | SIGNALISATION POUR UNE TRANSMISSION ET UNE RÉCEPTION MULTIPOINT COORDONNÉES (COMP) | [2017/04] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2016 | Search fee paid | 19.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/04] | 24.05.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2013058307 (KIM HYUNGTAE [KR], et al); | International search | [A]US2013058307 (KIM HYUNGTAE [KR], et al); | [Y]US2013303180 (WANG XIAOYI [CN], et al); |