EP3119698 - HYDROGEN PEROXIDE VAPOUR GENERATING PRODUCT AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/04] | STORAGE PRODUCT AND METHOD | ||
[2020/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coolsan Hygiene Solutions Pty Ltd. 47 Stephenson Street Cremorne, VIC 3121 / AU | [2017/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERICKSON, Gary, Roy Skywatch Observatory Timor Road Coonabarabran, NSW 2357 / AU | [2017/04] | Representative(s) | Purdylucey Intellectual Property 6-7 Harcourt Terrace D02 FH73 Dublin 2 / IE | [2020/37] |
Former [2017/04] | Purdy, Hugh Barry PurdyLucey Intellectual Property 6-7 Harcourt Terrace D2 Dublin / IE | Application number, filing date | 15765579.6 | 18.03.2015 | [2017/04] | WO2015AU00153 | Priority number, date | AU20140900941 | 18.03.2014 Original published format: AU 2014900941 | [2017/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015139075 | Date: | 24.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3119698 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3119698 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.09.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A01N59/00, A01P1/00, B65D81/22, B65D81/26, A61L9/12, A61L2/20, F24F3/14, A01N25/18, A01N59/14 | [2020/15] | CPC: |
A01N25/18 (EP,US);
B65D81/264 (US);
A61L2/20 (US);
A61L2/208 (US);
A61L9/12 (US);
F24F3/1411 (EP,US);
A61L2202/11 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A01N25/18, A01N59/00, A01N59/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/43] | A01N59/00, A01N59/14, A01N25/18, F24F3/14, A61L2/20, A61L9/12, B65D81/26, B65D81/22 | ||
Former IPC [2017/04] | B65D81/26, B65D81/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASSERSTOFFPEROXID-DAMPF ERZEUGENDES PRODUKT UND VERFAHREN | [2020/15] | English: | HYDROGEN PEROXIDE VAPOUR GENERATING PRODUCT AND METHOD | [2020/15] | French: | PRODUIT ET PROCÉDÉ DE GÉNÉRATION DE VAPEUR DE PEROXYDE D'HYDROGÈNE | [2020/15] |
Former [2017/04] | LAGERPRODUKT UND VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2017/04] | STORAGE PRODUCT AND METHOD | ||
Former [2017/04] | PRODUIT ET PROCÉDÉ DE STOCKAGE | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2016 | Search fee paid | 17.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 13.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/04] | 09.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 29.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.03.2015 | AL | 09.09.2020 | AT | 09.09.2020 | CY | 09.09.2020 | CZ | 09.09.2020 | DK | 09.09.2020 | EE | 09.09.2020 | FI | 09.09.2020 | HR | 09.09.2020 | LT | 09.09.2020 | LV | 09.09.2020 | MC | 09.09.2020 | MK | 09.09.2020 | MT | 09.09.2020 | PL | 09.09.2020 | RO | 09.09.2020 | RS | 09.09.2020 | SE | 09.09.2020 | SI | 09.09.2020 | SK | 09.09.2020 | SM | 09.09.2020 | BG | 09.12.2020 | NO | 09.12.2020 | GR | 10.12.2020 | IS | 09.01.2021 | PT | 11.01.2021 | LU | 18.03.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 18.03.2015 | |
AL | 09.09.2020 | ||
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CY | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
MK | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
LU | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 18.03.2015 | |
AL | 09.09.2020 | ||
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CY | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
LU | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 18.03.2015 | |
AL | 09.09.2020 | ||
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
LU | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
LU | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 09.09.2020 | |
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | CZ | 09.09.2020 | |
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 09.09.2020 | |
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]KR20060068459 ; | [XY]KR20130087974 ; | [Y]EP0261422 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * examples 82, 85, 86 ** claim 11 *; | [XY]US2006280665 (REES WAYNE M [US], et al) [X] 1,3,7,9,15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 40] , [0 41] * * tables 5, 6 * [Y] 1-15; | [XY]EP2179748 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-3,7,9-11,15 * examples 1-V, 1-VI * * claims 1, 4, 8, 13 * [Y] 1-15; | [XY]WO2011023560 (BASF SE [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,7 * page 2, line 19 - line 21 * * page 13, line 23 - line 33 * * example 7 * * claims 1, 2 * [Y] 1-15; | [Y]WO2011072326 (VM3 INTERNAT PTY LTD [AU], et al) [Y] 1-15 * example 4 * * claim 3 *; | [XY] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2007, no. 27, Database accession no. 2007-277930, XP002773869 & KR20060068459 A 20060621 (NEO PHARM CO LTD) [X] 1-4,7,9-12,15 * abstract * * page 5, paragraph 6 * [Y] 1-15 | [XY] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2013, no. 58, Database accession no. 2013-M31248, XP002773870 & KR20130087974 A 20130807 (HYUNG S P) [X] 1-3,8,10,11,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0045] , [0 46] , [0 66] , [0 69] * [Y] 1-15 | International search | [A]JPH11239608 (SAKAI TOKUEI) [A] 1-3, 8-10, 17-21 * See paragraph [0035] and figure 6. *; | [A]WO0106876 (MATSUSHITA REFRIGERATION [JP], et al) [A] 1-3, 8-10, 17-21* See abstract. *; | [X]US6592919 (MATTHEWS ANDREW ERNEST [US], et al) [X] 1-3, 8-10, 17-21 * See abstract; column 4, lines 33-35; column 7, lines 52-62; column 8, lines 6-12 and figure 1. *; | [A]US2009142235 (RICO BERNARDO N [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 8-10, 17-21 * See paragraphs [0047]-[0048] and figure 3. *; | [A]US2013302480 (GANDHI NIRANJAN RAMANLAL [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 8-10, 17-21 * See abstract and claim 1. * | Examination | WO2007070922 | WO2012075547 | by applicant | US2006280665 | AU2006202977B | KR20130087974 | AU20050907187 |