EP3169264 - IMAGE INTEGRATION AND ROBOTIC ENDOSCOPE CONTROL IN X-RAY SUITE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.11.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] |
Former [2017/21] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POPOVIC, Aleksandra c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
REINSTEIN, Aryeh Leib c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
NOONAN, David Paul c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2017/21] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2017/21] | Steffen, Thomas Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 15767248.6 | 14.07.2015 | [2017/21] | WO2015IB55305 | Priority number, date | US201462024532P | 15.07.2014 Original published format: US 201462024532 P | [2017/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016009339 | Date: | 21.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3169264 | Date: | 24.05.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B34/00 | [2017/21] | CPC: |
A61B34/30 (EP,US);
A61B1/04 (US);
A61B34/20 (US);
A61B6/12 (US);
A61B2034/301 (EP,US);
A61B2090/062 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/21] | Title | German: | BILDINTEGRATION UND STEUERUNG VON ROBOTISCHEM ENDOSKOP IN EINER RÖNTGEN-SUITE | [2017/21] | English: | IMAGE INTEGRATION AND ROBOTIC ENDOSCOPE CONTROL IN X-RAY SUITE | [2017/21] | French: | INTÉGRATION D'IMAGES ET COMMANDE D'ENDOSCOPE ROBOTIQUE DANS UNE INSTALLATION RADIOGRAPHIQUE | [2017/21] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/21] | 15.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2011086431 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15* page 5, line 10 - page 9, line 9; figures 4-6 *; | [XA]WO2014001948 (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1-5 * page 9, line 8 - page 14, line 2; figures 1-3 * * page 15, line 4 - page 16, line 13; figures 5A-B * [A] 6-15 |