EP3202141 - AUTOSTEREOSCOPIC DISPLAY DEVICE AND DRIVING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] |
Former [2017/32] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KROON, Bart High Tech Campus 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
JOHNSON, Mark Thomas High Tech Campus 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2017/32] | Representative(s) | Debets, René Jozef Willem Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2017/32] | Application number, filing date | 15767511.7 | 25.09.2015 | [2017/32] | WO2015EP72055 | Priority number, date | EP20140187049 | 30.09.2014 Original published format: EP 14187049 | [2017/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016050619 | Date: | 07.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3202141 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/04, G02F1/1343, G02B27/22, G02F1/29 | [2017/32] | CPC: |
G02F1/1323 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04N13/305 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04N13/398 (US);
G02B26/005 (US);
G02B30/26 (CN,RU);
G02B30/28 (EP,US);
G02F1/294 (EP,KR,US);
G06T15/00 (RU);
H04N13/315 (EP,KR,US);
H04N13/351 (EP,RU,US);
G02B30/31 (EP,US);
H04N13/324 (EP,US);
H04N13/363 (EP,CN,RU,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/32] | Title | German: | AUTOSTEREOSKOPISCHE ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND ANSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2017/32] | English: | AUTOSTEREOSCOPIC DISPLAY DEVICE AND DRIVING METHOD | [2017/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE ET DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE AUTOSTÉRÉOSCOPIQUE | [2017/32] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/32] | 28.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.05.2020 | 27.05.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/27] | 28.05.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2004075526 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,9-14 * page 8 - page 11 *; | [X]WO2007052183 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,5,7-10,14,15 * page 6, line 15 - page 10, line 18 *; | [X]WO2009098622 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,8,10,15 * page 12, line 24 - page 18, line 13 *; | [X]WO2013086046 (OSTENDO TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1,7,10,14 * page 27 - page 35 *; | [A]EP2736257 (LG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-5,9-13* paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0087] *; | [XP]EP2802148 (ETH ZUERICH [CH]) [XP] 1-3,10-12 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0021] * | Examination | EP1906226 | WO2013094841 | EP2797328 |