EP3122273 - VAPORIZATION ELECTRODES AND ELECTROSURGICAL DEVICES EQUIPPED THEREWITH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Endomedical Concepts, Inc. PO Box 3247 North Fort Myers, Florida 33918 / US | [2017/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARRETT, Jon D. 140 Kinsale Ave. Valparaiso, Indiana 46385 / US | 02 /
VANDUSSELDORP SR., Gregg Alan 1430 Appian Dr Punta Gordo, Florida 33950 / US | 03 /
VANDUSSELDORP II, Gregg 87 Sanctuary Dr. Valparaiso, Indiana 46385 / US | [2017/05] | Representative(s) | TLIP Limited Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/48] | TLIP Limited 14 King Street Leeds LS1 2HL / GB | ||
Former [2017/05] | TLIP Limited Leeds Innovation Centre 103 Clarendon Road Leeds LS2 9DF / GB | Application number, filing date | 15768023.2 | 27.03.2015 | [2017/05] | WO2015US23037 | Priority number, date | US201461971050P | 27.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461971050 P | [2017/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015148949 | Date: | 01.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3122273 | Date: | 01.02.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3122273 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.10.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/12, A61B18/14, A61B18/00 | [2017/49] | CPC: |
A61B18/14 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00547 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00577 (US);
A61B2018/00625 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1417 (EP);
A61B2018/1472 (US)
|
Former IPC [2017/05] | A61B18/12, A61B18/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERDAMPFUNGSELEKTRODEN UND DAMIT AUSGERÜSTETE ELEKTROCHIRURGISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN | [2017/05] | English: | VAPORIZATION ELECTRODES AND ELECTROSURGICAL DEVICES EQUIPPED THEREWITH | [2017/05] | French: | ÉLECTRODES DE VAPORISATION ET DISPOSITIFS ÉLECTROCHIRURGICAUX EN ÉTANT DOTÉS | [2017/05] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2016 | Search fee paid | 08.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/05] | 08.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.03.2015 | AL | 27.11.2019 | AT | 27.11.2019 | CY | 27.11.2019 | CZ | 27.11.2019 | DK | 27.11.2019 | EE | 27.11.2019 | ES | 27.11.2019 | FI | 27.11.2019 | HR | 27.11.2019 | IT | 27.11.2019 | LT | 27.11.2019 | LV | 27.11.2019 | MC | 27.11.2019 | MK | 27.11.2019 | MT | 27.11.2019 | NL | 27.11.2019 | PL | 27.11.2019 | RO | 27.11.2019 | RS | 27.11.2019 | SE | 27.11.2019 | SI | 27.11.2019 | SK | 27.11.2019 | SM | 27.11.2019 | TR | 27.11.2019 | BG | 27.02.2020 | NO | 27.02.2020 | GR | 28.02.2020 | GB | 27.03.2020 | IE | 27.03.2020 | IS | 27.03.2020 | LU | 27.03.2020 | BE | 31.03.2020 | CH | 31.03.2020 | FR | 31.03.2020 | LI | 31.03.2020 | PT | 19.04.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 27.03.2015 | |
AL | 27.11.2019 | ||
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CY | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
IT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
MT | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
TR | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
GB | 27.03.2020 | ||
IE | 27.03.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
LU | 27.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
FR | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
IT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
GB | 27.03.2020 | ||
IE | 27.03.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
LU | 27.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
FR | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
IT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IE | 27.03.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
LU | 27.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
FR | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IE | 27.03.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
LU | 27.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
FR | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
LU | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | FI | 27.11.2019 | |
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 27.11.2019 | |
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 27.11.2019 | |
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 27.11.2019 | |
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 27.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5354296 (TURKEL DAVID [US]) [I] 1,15 * figures 4a,4b,5a,5b *; | [X]US5827274 (BONNET LUDWIG [DE], et al) [X] 1-15 * figures 4-10 * * columns 2-3 *; | [I]US6032673 (SAVAGE GEORGE M [US], et al) [I] 1,15 * figure 33b *; | [A]US6197025 (GROSSI BENEDETTO [US], et al) [A] 1-15* figures 1-3 * | International search | [X]US5669906 (GROSSI BENEDETTO [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * See column 5, line 2-column 9, line 52; column 10, lines 24-33; claims 1-17; and figures 1-9. *; | [A]US5779700 (HAHNEN KEVIN F [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See column 2, line 27-column 5, line 11; claims 1-10; and figures 4-9. *; | [A]US6277114 (BULLIVANT JARRETT [GB], et al) [A] 1-20 * See column 2, line 55-column 14, line 23; claims 1-28, 33; and figures 1-4. *; | [A]US7704249 (WOLOSZKO JEAN [US], et al) [A] 1-20* See column 3, line 14-column 34, line 67; claims 1-10; and figures 1-37B. *; | [A]US2011282341 (CARMEL YUVAL [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0022]-[0129]; claims 1-34, 47; and figures 1-46. * |