EP3125357 - ELECTRICALLY DRIVEN VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.2019 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [2017/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAJIMA Takamitsu c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD. 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 02 /
ARUGA Tomohisa c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD. 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | [2017/05] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [2017/05] | Application number, filing date | 15768437.4 | 19.02.2015 | [2017/05] | WO2015JP54574 | Priority number, date | JP20140062846 | 26.03.2014 Original published format: JP 2014062846 | [2017/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015146387 | Date: | 01.10.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3125357 | Date: | 01.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3125357 | Date: | 28.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.10.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/6568, B60K11/04, B60L11/18, H01M10/613, H01M10/625, H01M10/647 | [2017/05] | CPC: |
H01M10/625 (EP,US);
B60K11/04 (US);
B60L50/64 (EP,US);
B60L50/66 (EP,US);
B60L58/26 (EP,US);
H01M10/613 (EP,US);
H01M10/647 (EP,US);
H01M10/6551 (US);
H01M10/6567 (US);
H01M10/6568 (EP,US);
H01M50/249 (EP,US);
B60K2001/005 (EP,US);
B60Y2200/91 (US);
B60Y2400/112 (US);
H01M2220/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCH BETRIEBENES FAHRZEUG | [2017/05] | English: | ELECTRICALLY DRIVEN VEHICLE | [2017/05] | French: | VÉHICULE À PROPULSION ÉLECTRIQUE | [2017/05] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2016 | Translation filed | 26.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2016 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/05] | 26.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.02.2015 | AL | 28.11.2018 | AT | 28.11.2018 | CY | 28.11.2018 | CZ | 28.11.2018 | DK | 28.11.2018 | EE | 28.11.2018 | ES | 28.11.2018 | FI | 28.11.2018 | HR | 28.11.2018 | IT | 28.11.2018 | LT | 28.11.2018 | LV | 28.11.2018 | MC | 28.11.2018 | MK | 28.11.2018 | NL | 28.11.2018 | PL | 28.11.2018 | RO | 28.11.2018 | RS | 28.11.2018 | SE | 28.11.2018 | SI | 28.11.2018 | SK | 28.11.2018 | SM | 28.11.2018 | TR | 28.11.2018 | IE | 19.02.2019 | LU | 19.02.2019 | MT | 19.02.2019 | BE | 28.02.2019 | BG | 28.02.2019 | CH | 28.02.2019 | GB | 28.02.2019 | LI | 28.02.2019 | NO | 28.02.2019 | GR | 01.03.2019 | IS | 28.03.2019 | PT | 28.03.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 19.02.2015 | |
AL | 28.11.2018 | ||
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CY | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
TR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IE | 19.02.2019 | ||
LU | 19.02.2019 | ||
MT | 19.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
GB | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CY | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
TR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IE | 19.02.2019 | ||
LU | 19.02.2019 | ||
MT | 19.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
GB | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
TR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IE | 19.02.2019 | ||
LU | 19.02.2019 | ||
MT | 19.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
GB | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
TR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IE | 19.02.2019 | ||
LU | 19.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
GB | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
IE | 19.02.2019 | ||
LU | 19.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
GB | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
IE | 19.02.2019 | ||
LU | 19.02.2019 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
LU | 19.02.2019 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
LU | 19.02.2019 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
LU | 19.02.2019 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 28.11.2018 | |
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 28.11.2018 | |
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 28.11.2018 | |
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 28.11.2018 | |
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 28.11.2018 | |
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 28.11.2018 | |
NO | 28.02.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2011146320 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-5* abstract *; | [A]JP2013051099 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0013]; figure 1 *; | [A]DE102011082565 (SB LIMOTIVE CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0010] , [0028]; figure 1 *; | [AD]JP2013062023 (BOSCH CORP, et al) [AD] 1-5 * paragraphs [0015] , [0025]; figures 1,3,4,5 * | International search | [A]JP2011146320 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-5* , paragraphs [0036] to [0064]; fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2013051099 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-5 * , paragraphs [0009] to [0028]; fig. 1 & WO 2013/031406 A1 * |