EP3207201 - SWING DOOR DRIVE AND SWING DOOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/34] | SWING DOOR DRIVE, SWING DOOR AND CONTROL DEVICE | ||
[2020/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hörmann KG Antriebstechnik Michaelisstr. 1 33803 Steinhagen / DE | [2017/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANKE, Michael Dr. Röttscherstrasse 4 33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE | 02 /
BEHNKE, Thomas Haferkamp 9 32257 Bünde / DE | 03 /
SCHRÖDER, Alexander Osterkamp 7 49324 Melle / DE | [2017/34] | Representative(s) | Kastel, Stefan Kastel Patentanwälte St.-Cajetan-Straße 41 81669 München / DE | [2017/34] | Application number, filing date | 15770546.8 | 28.09.2015 | [2017/34] | WO2015EP72288 | Priority number, date | DE201410114842 | 13.10.2014 Original published format: DE102014114842 | DE201410115189 | 17.10.2014 Original published format: DE102014115189 | [2017/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016058817 | Date: | 21.04.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3207201 | Date: | 23.08.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3207201 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/40, E05F15/63 | [2017/34] | CPC: |
E05F15/40 (EP);
E05F15/63 (EP);
E05F2015/631 (EP);
E05Y2400/36 (EP);
E05Y2400/456 (EP);
E05Y2400/53 (EP);
E05Y2600/45 (EP);
E05Y2600/46 (EP);
E05Y2800/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DREHFLÜGELTÜRANTRIEB UND DREHFLÜGELTÜR | [2020/09] | English: | SWING DOOR DRIVE AND SWING DOOR | [2020/09] | French: | ACTIONNEUR DE PORTE PIVOTANTE ET PORTE PIVOTANTE | [2020/09] |
Former [2017/34] | DREHFLÜGELTÜRANTRIEB, DREHFLÜGELTÜR UND STEUERVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2017/34] | SWING DOOR DRIVE, SWING DOOR AND CONTROL DEVICE | ||
Former [2017/34] | MÉCANISME D'ENTRAÎNEMENT DE PORTE À BATTANT, PORTE À BATTANT ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/34] | 15.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.05.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.09.2015 | AL | 05.08.2020 | CY | 05.08.2020 | DK | 05.08.2020 | EE | 05.08.2020 | ES | 05.08.2020 | FI | 05.08.2020 | HR | 05.08.2020 | LT | 05.08.2020 | LV | 05.08.2020 | MC | 05.08.2020 | MK | 05.08.2020 | MT | 05.08.2020 | NL | 05.08.2020 | PL | 05.08.2020 | RO | 05.08.2020 | RS | 05.08.2020 | SE | 05.08.2020 | SI | 05.08.2020 | SK | 05.08.2020 | SM | 05.08.2020 | AT | 28.09.2020 | IE | 28.09.2020 | LU | 28.09.2020 | BE | 30.09.2020 | BG | 05.11.2020 | NO | 05.11.2020 | GR | 06.11.2020 | IS | 05.12.2020 | PT | 07.12.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 28.09.2015 | |
AL | 05.08.2020 | ||
CY | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
MT | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
AT | 28.09.2020 | ||
IE | 28.09.2020 | ||
LU | 28.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
AT | 28.09.2020 | ||
IE | 28.09.2020 | ||
LU | 28.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
IE | 28.09.2020 | ||
LU | 28.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
LU | 28.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
LU | 28.09.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
LU | 28.09.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | DK | 05.08.2020 | |
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | DK | 05.08.2020 | |
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | DK | 05.08.2020 | |
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | ES | 05.08.2020 | |
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | ES | 05.08.2020 | |
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | ES | 05.08.2020 | |
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 05.08.2020 | |
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 05.08.2020 | |
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US5687507 (BERAN MARK A [US]) [X] 1,6,10 * column 4, line 23 - line 30 * * column 12, line 15 - line 35 * * figure 1 * [A] 2,3,7-9,11[I] 4,5 | Examination | EP2388424 |