EP3209869 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN ADJUSTABLE CAMSHAFT AND ADJUSTABLE CAMSHAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.2020 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2020 [2020/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Presta TecCenter AG Wirtschaftspark 37 9492 Eschen / LI | [2018/13] |
Former [2017/35] | For all designated states Thyssenkrupp Presta Teccenter Ag Wirtschaftspark 37 9492 Eschen / LI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRANDENBURGER, Henning Goetheweg 32 38871 Ilsenburg / DE | 02 /
PAEPLOW, Alexander Am Moosholz 3 38446 Wolfsburg / DE | 03 /
LÜBBERSTEDT, Alexander Huntestrasse 28 38120 Braunschweig / DE | [2017/46] |
Former [2017/35] | 01 /
BRANDENBURGER, Henning Goetheweg 32 38871 Ilsenburg / DE | ||
02 /
PAEPLOW, Alexander Berliner Platz 1D 38102 Braunschweig / DE | |||
03 /
LÜBBERSTEDT, Alexander Huntestrasse 28 38120 Braunschweig / DE | Representative(s) | thyssenkrupp Intellectual Property GmbH ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | [2017/35] | Application number, filing date | 15771153.2 | 30.09.2015 | [2017/35] | WO2015EP72588 | Priority number, date | DE20141015649 | 24.10.2014 Original published format: DE102014015649 | [2017/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016062511 | Date: | 28.04.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3209869 | Date: | 30.08.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F01L1/344, F01L1/047 | [2017/35] | CPC: |
F01L1/047 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F01L1/34413 (US);
F01L13/0057 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F01L2001/0473 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F01L2303/00 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F01L2303/02 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/35] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER VERSTELLBAREN NOCKENWELLE UND VERSTELLBARE NOCKENWELLE | [2017/35] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN ADJUSTABLE CAMSHAFT AND ADJUSTABLE CAMSHAFT | [2017/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN ARBRE À CAMES VARIABLE ET ARBRE À CAMES VARIABLE | [2017/35] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/35] | 04.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/06] | 24.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]GB2233734 (GKN AUTOMOTIVE AG [DE]) [X] 1,4-6,8-10 * abstract * * figures 2-4 * [Y] 2,3; | [XY]US5664463 (AMBORN PETER [DE], et al) [X] 1,4-6,8-10 * abstract * * figures 1,1a * * column 5, lines 39-41 * [Y] 2,3; | [XYI]US5862783 (LEWIS HENRY E [US]) [X] 1,4-10 * figure 4 * * column 4, lines 54-67 - column 5, lines 1-5 * [Y] 2,3 [I] 9; | [Y]DE19918230 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [Y] 3 * figure 3 ** column 3, lines 54-63 - column 4, lines 1-4 *; | [XY]DE102007042053 (MAHLE INT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,6 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0023] * [Y] 2,3 |