EP3204484 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR CULTURING MICROBIAL AND CELLULAR SEED CULTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Life Technologies Corporation 5823 Newton Drive Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | [2017/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWN, Jason D. 252 East 200 South Logan, Utah 84321 / US | [2017/33] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/33] | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 15771495.7 | 23.09.2015 | [2017/33] | WO2015US51590 | Priority number, date | US201414507548 | 06.10.2014 Original published format: US201414507548 | [2017/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016057216 | Date: | 14.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3204484 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/00, C12M3/00, C12M3/06 | [2017/33] | CPC: |
C12M23/14 (EP,CN,US);
C12M23/28 (EP,CN,US);
C12M23/46 (EP,CN,US);
C12M27/16 (EP,CN,US);
C12M27/20 (EP,CN,US);
A01G9/02 (US);
A01H4/005 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR KULTIVIERUNG MIKROBIELLER UND ZELLULÄRER SAATKULTUREN | [2017/33] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR CULTURING MICROBIAL AND CELLULAR SEED CULTURES | [2017/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES DE CULTURE DE CULTURES D'ENSEMENCEMENT MICROBIENNES ET CELLULAIRES | [2017/33] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/33] | 03.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2008206862 (ASGARI SOHEIL [DE]) [Y] 17,18 * figures 3,4,6,10,13 ** paragraphs [0002] , [0021] , [0022] , [0024] , [0028] , [0031] , [0067] - [0072] *; | [Y]US2011198286 (NIAZI SARFARAZ K [US]) [Y] 1,10,14,16-18,20,23 * paragraphs [0001] , [0097]; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [Y]US2011217690 (NIAZI SARFARAZ K [US]) [Y] 1,10,14,16-18,20,23 * paragraphs [0001] , [0015] , [0019] , [0026] , [0027] , [0029] , [0041]; figure 1; claims 1,11 * | by applicant | US2002131654 | US7487688 | US7901934 |