EP3126502 - COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING CH848 ENVELOPES AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.04.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.10.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Duke University 2812 Erwin Road, Suite 306 Durham, NC 27705 / US | For all designated states The Trustees of The University of Pennsylvania 3160 Chestnut Street Suite 200 Philadelphia, PA 19104 / US | For all designated states Los Alamos National Security, LLC Los Alamos National Laboratory PPO. Box 1663 LC/IP MS A187 Los Alamos, NM 87545 / US | [2017/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYNES, Barton, F. c/o Duke University 2812 Erwin Road Suite 306 Durham, NC 27705 / US | 02 /
HAHN, Beatrice, H. c/o The Trustees Of The University Of Pennsylvania 3160 Chestnut Street Suite 200 Philadelphia, PA 19104 / US | 03 /
SHAW, George, M. c/o The Trustees Of The University Of Pennsylvania 3160 Chestnut Street Suite 200 Philadelphia, PA 19104 / US | 04 /
KORBER, Bette, T. c/o Los Alamos National Security LLC Los Alamos National Laboratory LC/IP Los Alamos, NM 84545 / US | 05 /
HRABER, Peter, T. c/o Los Alamos National Security LLC Los Alamos National Laboratory LC/IP Los Alamos, NM 84545 / US | [2017/06] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/06] | Atkinson, Jennifer Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15772335.4 | 31.03.2015 | [2017/06] | WO2015US23632 | Priority number, date | US201461972649P | 31.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461972649 P | [2017/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015153638 | Date: | 08.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3126502 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.10.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/49, C07K14/155, A61K31/7088, A61K39/21 | [2017/06] | CPC: |
A61K31/7088 (EP,US);
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61K39/21 (US);
C07K14/155 (US);
A61K2039/70 (EP,US);
C12N2740/16034 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/06] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT CH848-HÜLLPROTEINEN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2017/06] | English: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING CH848 ENVELOPES AND USES THEREOF | [2017/06] | French: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRENANT DES ENVELOPPES DE CH848, ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2017/06] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2016 | Search fee paid | 31.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/06] | 31.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]WO2013006688 (UNIV DUKE [US], et al) [I] 8-13 * abstract * * page 10, paragraph l - page 11, paragraph 2 * * page 17, paragraph 1 * * page 19, paragraph 2; figures 43/56-44/56 * [Y] 1-7,14,15; | [IY]WO2011109511 (INT AIDS VACCINE INITIATIVE [US], et al) [I] 8-13 * abstract * * figure 9; claims 1-17 * [Y] 1-7,14,15; | [IY]WO2011106100 (UNIV DUKE [US], et al) [I] 8-13 * abstract * * page 53; claims 1-17 * [Y] 1-7,14,15; | [IY]WO2013052095 (UNIV DUKE [US], et al) [I] 8-13 * abstract * [Y] 1-7,14,15; | [IY] - M. A. MOODY ET AL, "HIV-1 gp120 Vaccine Induces Affinity Maturation in both New and Persistent Antibody Clonal Lineages", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (20120715), vol. 86, no. 14, doi:10.1128/JVI.00426-12, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 7496 - 7507, XP055094024 [I] 8-13 * abstract * [Y] 1-7,14,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.00426-12 | [IY] - BARTON F HAYNES ET AL, "B-cell-lineage immunogen design in vaccine development with HIV-1 as a case study", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20120501), vol. 30, no. 5, doi:10.1038/nbt.2197, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 423 - 433, XP055074710 [I] 8-13 * abstract * [Y] 1-7,14,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2197 | [IY] - D. C. MONTEFIORI ET AL, "Magnitude and Breadth of the Neutralizing Antibody Response in the RV144 and Vax003 HIV-1 Vaccine Efficacy Trials", JOURNAL OF INFECTIOUS DISEASES. JID, CHICAGO, IL., (20120525), vol. 206, no. 3, doi:10.1093/infdis/jis367, ISSN 0022-1899, pages 431 - 441, XP055403961 [I] 8-13 * abstract * [Y] 1-7,14,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/infdis/jis367 | [T] - MATTIA BONSIGNORI ET AL, "Staged induction of HIV-1 glycan-dependent broadly neutralizing antibodies", SCIENCE TRANSLATIONAL MEDICINE, (20170315), vol. 9, no. 381, doi:10.1126/scitranslmed.aai7514, ISSN 1946-6234, page eaai7514, XP055403851 [T] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/scitranslmed.aai7514 | International search | [A]WO2014042669 (UNIV DUKE [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * See claim 1. *; | [A]US7951377 (KORBER BETTE T [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * See abstract; SEQ ID NO: 99. *; | [A]US7655774 (MULLINS JAMES I [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * See abstract; SEQ ID NO: 100. *; | [A]US8048431 (HAYNES BARTON F [US]) [A] 1-8 * See abstract; SEQ ID NO: 41. * | [A] - NCBI, GenBank, (20130916), Database accession no. AGV34666.1, XP055358975 [A] 1-8 * See the whole document. * | by applicant | WO2013006688 | US7951377 | - Immunol. Rev., (20130000), vol. 254, pages 225 - 244 | - WALKER et al., Science, (20090000), vol. 326, pages 285 - 289 | - WALKER et al., Nature, (20110000), vol. 477, pages 466 - 470 | - BURTON et al., Science, (20120000), vol. 337, pages 183 - 186 | - KWONGMASCOLA, Immunity, (20120000), vol. 37, pages 412 - 425 | - ZHOU et al., Science, (20100000), vol. 329, pages 856 - 817 | - SCHEID et al., Science, (20110000), vol. 333, pages 1633 - 1637 | - SATTENTAUMCMICHAEL, F1000 Biol. Rep, (20100000), vol. 2, page 60 | - STAMATOTOS, Curr. Opin. Immunol., (20120000), vol. 24, pages 316 - 323 | - HAYNES et al., Science, (20050000), vol. 308, pages 1906 - 1908 | - HAYNES et al., Nat. Biotechnol., (20120000), vol. 30, pages 423 - 433 | - MOUQUETNUSSENZWEIG, Cell Mol. Life Sci., (20120000), vol. 69, pages 1435 - 1445 | - SCHEID et al., Nature, (20090000), vol. 458, pages 636 - 640 | - CHEN et al., AIDS Res. Human Retrovirol., (20080000), vol. 23, page 11 | - DIMITROL, MAbs, (20100000), vol. 2, pages 347 - 356 | - MA et al., PLoS Pathog, (20010000), vol. 7, page e1002200 | - PANCERA et al., J. Virol., (20100000), vol. 84, pages 8098 - 8110 | - XIAO et al., Biochem. Biophys. Res. Commun., (20090000), vol. 390, pages 404 - 409 | - BONSIGNORI et al., J. Virol., (20110000), vol. 85, pages 11502 - 11519 | - MOUQUET et al., Nature, (20100000), vol. 467, pages 591 - 595 | - HOOT et al., PLoS Pathog, (20130000), vol. 9, page e1003106 | - KEELE et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (20080000), vol. 105, pages 7552 - 7557 | - RICHMAN et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (20030000), vol. 100, pages 4144 - 4149 | - CORTI et al., PLoS One, (20100000), vol. 5, page e8805 | - CORTI et al., PLos One, (20100000), vol. 5, page e8805 | - KLEIN et al., J. Exp. Med., (20120000), vol. 209, pages 1469 - 1479 | - LYNCH et al., J. Virol., (20120000), vol. 86, pages 7588 - 7595 | - MOORE et al., Curr. Opin. HIV AIDS, (20090000), vol. 4, pages 358 - 363 | - LIAO et al., J. Exp. Med., (20110000), vol. 208, pages 2237 - 2249 | - MOORE et al., Curr. Opin. HTV AIDS, (20090000), vol. 4, pages 358 - 363 | - LIAO et al., Virology, (20060000), vol. 353, pages 268 - 82 | - BAROUCH DH et al., Nature Med, (20100000), vol. 16, pages 319 - 23 | - YU, JS et al., Clinical Vaccine Immunol, (20070000), vol. 14, pages 886 - 093 | - ibid, (20060000), vol. 13, pages 1204 - 11 | - HAYNES et al., Nature Biotech, (20120000), vol. 30, pages 423 - 433 | - TOMARAS, G et al., J. Virol., (20080000), vol. 82, page 12449 | - LIAO, HX et al., JEM, (20110000), vol. 208, page 2237 | - LIAO et al., Nature, (20130000), vol. 496, pages 469 - 476 | - GRAHAM BSENAMA MENASON MCGORDON IJPEEL SA et al., "DNA Vaccine Delivered by a Needle-Free Injection Device Improves Potency of Priming for Antibody and CD8+ T-Cell Responses after rAd5 Boost in a Randomized Clinical Trial", PLoS ONE, (20130000), vol. 8, no. 4, page e59340,9 | - KIBLER KV et al., PLoS One, (20111109), vol. 6, page e25674 | - PERREAU M et al., J. virology, (20110000), vol. 85, pages 9854 - 62 | - CANY et al., Journal of Hepatology, (20110000), vol. 54, pages 115 - 121 | - ARNAOTY et al., Mobile Genetic Elements: Protocols and Genomic Applications, Methods in Molecular Biology, (20120000), vol. 859, pages 293 - 305 | - ARNAOTY et al., Mol Genet Genomics, (20130800), vol. 288, no. 7-8, pages 347 - 63 | - CAS , no. 765317-72-4 | - Nature, (19950000), vol. 373, page 252 | - PNAS, (20100000), vol. 107, page 181 | - J. Immunol., (20110000), vol. 187, page 3785 | WO2012US00442 |