EP3127880 - INTERMEDIATE FILM FOR LAMINATED GLASS, AND LAMINATED GLASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd. 4-4, Nishitemma 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8565 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2017/06] | For all designated states Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd. 4-4, Nishitemma 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8565 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAMOTO, Masaki c/o SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO. LTD. 1259 Izumi, Minakuchi-cho Kouka-shi Shiga 528-8585 / JP | 02 /
YAMAGUCHI, Kouhei c/o SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO. LTD. 1259 Izumi, Minakuchi-cho Kouka-shi Shiga 528-8585 / JP | 03 /
NAKAJIMA, Daisuke c/o SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO. LTD. 1259 Izumi, Minakuchi-cho Kouka-shi Shiga 528-8585 / JP | [2017/06] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2017/06] | Application number, filing date | 15772811.4 | 31.03.2015 | [2017/06] | WO2015JP60268 | Priority number, date | JP20140074230 | 31.03.2014 Original published format: JP 2014074230 | [2017/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015152301 | Date: | 08.10.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3127880 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.10.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C03C27/12, B32B17/10, B32B27/00, B32B27/30 | [2017/06] | CPC: |
B32B17/10036 (EP,KR,RU,US);
C03C27/10 (RU);
B32B17/10678 (EP,RU,US);
B32B17/10761 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,KR,RU,US);
B32B27/20 (EP,KR,RU,US);
B32B27/22 (EP,KR,RU,US);
B32B27/42 (EP,KR,US);
B32B37/10 (RU,US);
B32B2250/03 (EP,US);
B32B2307/304 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/54 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
B32B17/10005, B32B2367/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/06] | Title | German: | ZWISCHENFOLIE FÜR VERBUNDGLAS UND VERBUNDGLAS | [2017/06] | English: | INTERMEDIATE FILM FOR LAMINATED GLASS, AND LAMINATED GLASS | [2017/06] | French: | FILM INTERMÉDIAIRE POUR VERRE FEUILLETÉ ET VERRE FEUILLETÉ | [2017/06] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2016 | Translation filed | 06.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2016 | Search fee paid | 06.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 06.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/06] | 06.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/46] | 03.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4952457 (CARTIER GEORGE E [US], et al); | [X]US5091258 (MORAN JAMES R [US]); | [A]US5455103 (HOAGLAND JOHN C [US], et al); | [X]US2003035935 (WACHI NAOTAKA [JP], et al); | [X]EP1874535 (SOLUTIA INC [US]); | [A]WO2013031884 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP], et al); | [X]US2013183532 (SHIMAMOTO MICHIO [JP], et al); | [P]US2014227489 (INUI YOSHIHIRO [JP]); | [E]EP3112325 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]); | [E]EP3112326 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) | International search | [A]JPH1086659 (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE); | [XY]JP2003516921 ; | [XY]JP2009161406 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD); | [XY]JP2009298661 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD) |