EP3127515 - THUMB-SUCKING DETERRENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yang, Su Jung 102-2003 Samchulli Apt. 75 Kyungin-ro 8 gil Guro-gu Seoul 152-788 / KR | [2017/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2017/06] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Michael Austin, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/06] | Shaw, Daniel John Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 15772840.3 | 29.03.2015 | [2017/06] | WO2015KR03054 | Priority number, date | KR20140038925 | 01.04.2014 Original published format: KR 20140038925 | [2017/06] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015152574 | Date: | 08.10.2015 | Language: | KO | [2015/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3127515 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.10.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/50 | [2017/06] | CPC: |
A61F5/50 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/06] | Title | German: | ABSCHRECKUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR DAUMENLUTSCHEN | [2017/06] | English: | THUMB-SUCKING DETERRENT DEVICE | [2017/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF DISSUADANT DE SUCER LE POUCE | [2017/06] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2016 | Translation filed | 15.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2016 | Search fee paid | 15.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/06] | 15.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/50] | 04.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4506663 (BARON WALTER [US]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 34 - column 2, line 35; figures 1, 2, 3 and 5; claim 1 * [I] 2-12; | [X]US2006219251 (RAY CHARLES D [US]) [X] 1 * figures * | International search | [XA]KR20130000969U (PARK, Ju Hyun) [X] 1-3, 5, 7-10 * See abstract, figures (1-4) pages (3, 4) and claims (1, 2) * [A] 4, 6, 11, 12; | [A]JPH0568510U (SHIMIZU SEIJI) [A] 1-12 * See abstract, figures (1, 2), pages (4-7) and claims (1, 2) *; | [A]US4506663 (BARON WALTER [US]) [A] 1-12 * See abstract, figures (2-4), columns (2-4) and claims (1-3) *; | [A]KR200251593Y (KIM, Jong Hyun) [A] 1-12 * See abstract, figures (1, 2), pages (4-6) and claims (1-7) * |