EP3126982 - SCANNING MEMORY FOR DE-DUPLICATION USING RDMA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2018 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Strato Scale Ltd. 14 Maskit Street 4673314 Herzliya / IL | [2017/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GORDON, Abel 3 Kashtan Street 3498425 Haifa / IL | 02 /
BEN-YEHUDA, Muli 27 Yakinton Street 3479264 Haifa / IL | 03 /
HUDZIA, Benoit Guillaume Charles Flat 501 Lucas Bdg Ormeau Avenue Northern Ireland F- Belfast BT2 8HB ??? / FR | 04 /
BOGNER, Etay 39 Even Sapir Street 6954624 Tel Aviv / IL | [2017/06] | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/06] | Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 15772850.2 | 25.03.2015 | [2017/06] | WO2015IB52179 | Priority number, date | US201461974489P | 03.04.2014 Original published format: US 201461974489 P | US201414543920 | 18.11.2014 Original published format: US201414543920 | [2017/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015150978 | Date: | 08.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3126982 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 08.10.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/00, G06F13/14, G06F12/02, G06F3/06, G06F13/00, G06F15/173 | [2018/05] | CPC: |
G06F3/0608 (EP,US);
G06F12/0223 (EP,US);
G06F12/121 (US);
G06F13/00 (EP,US);
G06F15/17331 (US);
G06F3/0641 (EP,US);
G06F3/065 (US);
G06F3/067 (EP,US);
G06F12/0292 (EP,US);
G06F2209/509 (EP,US);
G06F2212/1024 (EP,US);
G06F2212/1044 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/06] | G06F12/00, G06F13/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/06] | Title | German: | ABTASTSPEICHER ZUR ENTDUPLIZIERUNG MITTELS RDMA | [2017/06] | English: | SCANNING MEMORY FOR DE-DUPLICATION USING RDMA | [2017/06] | French: | BALAYAGE DE MÉMOIRE À LA RECHERCHE DE DÉDUPLICATION AU MOYEN DE RDMA | [2017/06] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2016 | Search fee paid | 13.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/06] | 13.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.06.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2011055471 (THATCHER JONATHAN [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8,9,11-14 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0081] * * paragraph [0123] - paragraph [0141] * * paragraph [0160] - paragraph [0191] * * figures 1-15 * [A] 7,10; | [A]US2012124282 (FRANK SHAHAR [IL], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0144] - paragraph [0205] * * paragraph [0255] - paragraph [0279] * * paragraph [0459] - paragraph [0460] * * figures 1-11 *; | [A]US2012158709 (GAONKAR SHRAVAN [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0058] ** figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2013024645 (CHERITON DAVID R [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0108] - paragraph [0110] * * figures 1-6 *; | [XA]US8656386 (BAIMETOV ILYA [US], et al) [X] 1,3,7,8,10,13,14 * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 2 * * column 6, line 11 - column 7, line 61 * * column 10, line 35 - column 16, line 16 * * claim 23 * * figures 1-8 * [A] 2,4-6,9,11,12 | International search | [A]US2008294696 (FRANDZEL YUVAL [US]) [A] 1-31* abstract, the whole doc. *; | [A]WO2009033074 (EMC CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-31 * abstract, the whole doc. *; | [A]US2011055471 (THATCHER JONATHAN [US], et al) [A] 1-31 * par. 0049, 0058, 0059 *; | [A]US2012233425 (YUEH JEDIDIAH [US]) [A] 1-31 * abstract, the whole doc. * |