EP3194397 - 2-[BIS(4-FLUOROPHENYL)METHYL]-2,7-DIAZASPIRO[4.5]DECAN-10-ONE DERIVATIVES AND RELATED COMPOUNDS AS INHIBITORS OF THE HUMAN DOPAMINE-ACTIVE-TRANSPORTER (DAT) PROTEIN FOR THE TREATMENT OF E.G. ATTENTION DEFICIT DISORDER (ADD) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chronos Therapeutics Limited 41 Cornmarket Street Oxford OX1 3HA / GB | [2017/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEMERARO, Teresa c/o Aptuit (Verona) S.r.l. Via Alessandro Fleming 4 I-37135 Verona / IT | 02 /
TARSI, Luca c/o Aptuit (Verona) S.r.l. Via Alessandro Fleming 4 I-37135 Verona / IT | 03 /
MICHELI, Fabrizio c/o Aptuit (Verona) S.r.l. Via Alessandro Fleming 4 I-37135 Verona / IT | 04 /
LUKER, Tim 32 Flamingo Court Nottingham NG7 1GJ / GB | 05 /
CREMONESI, Susanna c/o Aptuit (Verona) S.r.l. Via Alessandro Fleming 4 I-37135 Verona / IT | [2017/30] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/30] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 15774985.4 | 14.09.2015 | [2017/30] | WO2015IB57029 | Priority number, date | GB20140016346 | 16.09.2014 Original published format: GB 201416346 | [2017/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016042451 | Date: | 24.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3194397 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/10, C07D491/20, C07D498/10, C07D513/10, A61K31/438, A61K31/499, A61K31/537, A61K31/547, A61P15/10, A61P25/22, A61P25/30, A61P25/04, A61P25/20, A61P3/04 | [2017/30] | CPC: |
C07D471/10 (EP,CN,US);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/10 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P25/34 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/30] | Title | German: | 2-[BIS(4-FLUOROPHENYL)METHYL]-2,7-DIAZASPIRO[4.5]DECAN-10-ON-DERIVATE UND VERWANDTE VERBINDUNGEN ALS INHIBITOREN DES MENSCHLICHEN DOPAMIN-ACTIV-TRANSPORTER (DAT) PROTEINS ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON Z.B. AUFMERKSAMKEITSSTÖRUNGEN | [2018/35] | English: | 2-[BIS(4-FLUOROPHENYL)METHYL]-2,7-DIAZASPIRO[4.5]DECAN-10-ONE DERIVATIVES AND RELATED COMPOUNDS AS INHIBITORS OF THE HUMAN DOPAMINE-ACTIVE-TRANSPORTER (DAT) PROTEIN FOR THE TREATMENT OF E.G. ATTENTION DEFICIT DISORDER (ADD) | [2017/30] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE 2-[BIS(4-FLUOROPHÉNYL)MÉTHYL]-2,7-DIAZASPIRO[4.5]DECAN-10-ONE ET COMPOSÉS SIMILAIRES EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DU PROTEIN HUMAINE DU TRANSPORT ACTIF DE LA DOPAMINE (TAD) POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU TROUBLE DU DÉFICIT DE L'ATTENTION | [2018/35] |
Former [2017/30] | 2-[BIS(4-FLUORPHENYL)METHYL]-2,7-DIAZASPIRO[4.5]DECAN-10-ON-DERIVATE UND VERWANDTE VERBINDUNGEN ALS HEMMER DES MENSCHLICHEN DOPAMIN-AKTIV-TRANSPORTER (DAT)-PROTEINS ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON Z.B. AUFMERKSAMKEITSSTÖRUNGEN (ADD) | ||
Former [2017/30] | DÉRIVÉS DE 2-[BIS(4-FLUOROPHÉNYL)MÉTHYL]-2,7-DIAZASPIRO[4.5]DÉCAN-10-ONE ET COMPOSÉS APPARENTÉS EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE LA PROTÉINE TRANSPORTEUSE ACTIVE DE DOPAMINE (DAT) HUMAINE POUR LE TRAITEMENT PAR EX. D'UN TROUBLE DE DÉFICIT DE L'ATTENTION (TDA) | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/30] | 12.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.05.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/13] | 11.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5698567 (GUILLONNEAU CLAUDE [FR], et al) [X] 1-13 * examples 6-27, 31-42 *; | [A]US6835371 (ELMALEH DAVID R [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * example 26 * * claims 1,2,8,10 * | [X] - FRITCH, PAUL C.; KRAJEWSKI, JEFFREY, "Design, syntheses, and SAR of 2,8-diazaspiro[4.5]decanones as T-type calcium channel antagonists", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (2010), vol. 20, no. 22, doi:10.1016/j.bmcl.2010.09.098, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 6375 - 6378, XP002750980 [X] 1-15 * page 6375, column r, paragraph 1st * * page 6376; right-hand column; table 1; compounds 11-21; scheme 2 * * page 6377; left-hand column; scheme 3; compound 21 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2010.09.098 |