EP3129116 - CONTAMINATION MITIGATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.01.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.02.2019 [2019/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Butamax Advanced Biofuels LLC Route 141 & Henry Clay Dupont Experimental Station Building 356 Wilmington, DE 19880-0356 / US | [2017/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERNFELD, Adam 711 Beversrede Trail Kennett Square, PA 19384 / US | 02 /
BURLEW, Keith H. 502 Burnham Lane Middletown, Delaware 19709 / US | 03 /
CALABRIA, Anthony R. 1802 N Scott St Wilmington, Delaware 19806 / US | 04 /
COFFEY, Duncan 405 W Bartram Lane Hockessin, Delaware 19707 / US | 05 /
FUCHS, Benjamin 234 Lyndhurst Avenue Wilmington, Delaware 19803 / US | 06 /
GOES, Ana Paula Alameda Itapecuru 244 - apt. 12 Alphaville 06454-080 Barueri / BR | 07 /
HENRY, Adam David 120 Crestview Drive Kenneth Square, Pennsylvania 19348 / US | 08 /
TAMULIS, Walter 969 Market Street 507 San Diego, California 92101 / US | 09 /
ZAHER, Joseph J. 3 Haileys Trail Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | [2017/13] |
Former [2017/10] | 01 /
BERNFELD, Adam 711 Beversrede Trail Kennett Square, PA 19384 / US | ||
02 /
BURLEW, Keith H. 502 Burnham Lane Middletown, Delaware 19709 / US | |||
03 /
CALABRIA, Anthony R. 2002 W 16th Street Wilmington, Delaware 19806 / US | |||
04 /
COFFEY, Duncan 405 W Bartram Lane Hockessin, Delaware 19707 / US | |||
05 /
FUCHS, Benjamin 234 Lyndhurst Avenue Wilmington, Delaware 19803 / US | |||
06 /
GOES, Ana Paula Alameda Itapecuru 244 - apt. 12 Alphaville 06454-080 Barueri / BR | |||
07 /
HENRY, Adam David 120 Crestview Drive Kenneth Square, Pennsylvania 19348 / US | |||
08 /
TAMULIS, Walter 969 Market Street 507 San Diego, California 92101 / US | |||
09 /
ZAHER, Joseph J. 3 Haileys Trail Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | |||
Former [2017/07] | 01 /
BERNFELD, Adam 405 Jacobsen Drive Newark, Delaware 19702 / US | ||
02 /
BURLEW, Keith H. 502 Burnham Lane Middletown, Delaware 19709 / US | |||
03 /
CALABRIA, Anthony R. 2002 W 16th Street Wilmington, Delaware 19806 / US | |||
04 /
COFFEY, Duncan 405 W Bartram Lane Hockessin, Delaware 19707 / US | |||
05 /
FUCHS, Benjamin 234 Lyndhurst Avenue Wilmington, Delaware 19803 / US | |||
06 /
GOES, Ana Paula Alameda Itapecuru 244 - apt. 12 Alphaville 06454-080 Barueri / BR | |||
07 /
HENRY, Adam David 120 Crestview Drive Kenneth Square, Pennsylvania 19348 / US | |||
08 /
TAMULIS, Walter 969 Market Street 507 San Diego, California 92101 / US | |||
09 /
ZAHER, Joseph J. 3 Haileys Trail Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/07] | Towler, Philip Dean Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 15776468.9 | 10.04.2015 | [2017/07] | WO2015US25256 | Priority number, date | US201461978410P | 11.04.2014 Original published format: US 201461978410 P | [2017/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015157607 | Date: | 15.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3129116 | Date: | 15.02.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.10.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B01D3/00, B08B3/04, C11D1/68, C12M1/40 | [2017/07] | CPC: |
C12M39/00 (EP,US);
A61L2/04 (US);
B01D3/002 (EP,US);
B08B9/08 (EP,US);
C12F3/00 (EP,US);
C12M21/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/07] | Title | German: | KONTAMINIERUNGSEINSCHRÄNKUNG | [2017/07] | English: | CONTAMINATION MITIGATION | [2017/07] | French: | ATTÉNUATION DE LA CONTAMINATION | [2017/07] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2016 | Search fee paid | 31.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/07] | 17.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/06] | 17.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2011159967 (BUTAMAX TM ADVANCED BIOFUELS [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * See [0006], [0216/Table 3], and [0239] with regard to COFA *; | [A] - DAFOE ET AL, "In situ product removal in fermentation systems: improved process performance and rational extractant selection", BIOTECHNOLOGY LETTERS, (20131020), vol. 36, pages 443 - 460, XP002776976 [A] 1-9 * See pages 445-446 (Table 1); early online publication * | [AP] - HUANG ET AL, "Separation and purification of biobutanol during bioconversion of biomass", SEPARATION AND PURIFICATION TECHNOLOGY, (20140617), vol. 132, pages 513 - 540, XP029038467 [AP] 1-9 * See page 521 (Table 4); early online publication * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.seppur.2014.06.013 | International search | [Y]US2010279370 (PARTEN WILLIAM D [US]) [Y] 1-40 * , para [0013]-[0083] *; | [Y]US2012015862 (TRAVIS BENJAMIN R [US], et al) [Y] 1-40 * , para [0005], [0009], [0039], [0042], [0044], [0054] *; | [Y]US2013197279 (WRIGHT MICHAEL E [US]) [Y] 1-40 * , para [0016]-[0038] *; | [Y]US2014024064 (BURLEW KEITH H [US], et al) [Y] 1-40 * , para [0011], [0088]-[0091], [0173]-[0185], [0191], [0198], [0335], [0340], [0562] *; | [Y] - BREMER et al., "Laboratory scale Clean-In-Place (CIP) studies on the effectiveness of different caustic and acid wash steps on the removal of dairy biofilms.", International Journal of Food Microbiology, vol. 106, no. Issue 3, (20060215), pages 254 - 262, URL: http://www.ncbi.ntm.nih.gov/pubmed, (20150715), XP024956527 [Y] 1-40 * . Abstract only * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijfoodmicro.2005.07.004 |