EP3129406 - CONJUGATED COMPOUNDS COMPRISING CYSTEINE-ENGINEERED ANTIBODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2019 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.10.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2023 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medimmune, LLC One Medimmune Way Gaithersburg, Maryland 20878 / US | [2017/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAO, Changshou c/o MedImmune LLC One MedImmune Way Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US | 02 /
RAINEY, Godfrey c/o MedImmune LLC One MedImmune Way Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US | 03 /
GAO, Cuihua c/o MedImmune LLC One MedImmune Way Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US | [2017/07] | Representative(s) | AstraZeneca Intellectual Property Eastbrook House Shaftesbury Road Cambridge CB2 8BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/02] | AstraZeneca Milstein Building Granta Park Cambridge CB21 6GH / GB | ||
Former [2017/07] | Winter, Christopher Spencer MedImmune Limited Milstein Building Granta Park Cambridge CB21 6GH / GB | Application number, filing date | 15777039.7 | 10.04.2015 | [2017/07] | WO2015US25237 | Priority number, date | US201461978481P | 11.04.2014 Original published format: US 201461978481 P | [2017/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015157595 | Date: | 15.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3129406 | Date: | 15.02.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3129406 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.10.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/30, A61K47/68 | [2017/49] | CPC: |
C07K16/30 (EP,RU,US);
A61K47/68 (RU,US);
A61K47/68031 (EP,RU,US);
A61K47/6811 (EP,RU,US);
A61K47/6817 (US);
A61K47/6889 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
C07K16/00 (US);
C12N15/63 (RU);
C07K2317/40 (EP,US);
C07K2317/52 (EP,US);
C07K2317/524 (EP,US);
C07K2317/526 (EP,US);
C07K2317/71 (EP,US);
C07K2317/73 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/07] | C07K16/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONJUGIERTE VERBINDUNGEN MIT CYSTEIN-MANIPULIERTEN ANTIKÖRPERN | [2017/07] | English: | CONJUGATED COMPOUNDS COMPRISING CYSTEINE-ENGINEERED ANTIBODIES | [2017/07] | French: | COMPOSÉS CONJUGUÉS COMPRENANT DES ANTICORPS À CYSTÉINE MANIPULÉE | [2017/07] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2016 | Search fee paid | 21.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/07] | 21.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2022/28] | deleted | ||
Former [2020/11] | CY | 10.04.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007111260 (GAO CHANGSHOU [US], et al); | [AD]WO2008070593 (SEATTLE GENETICS INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2013055990 (SEATTLE GENETICS INC [US], et al); | International search | [A]US2008050310 (EBENS ALLEN J JR [US], et al); | [X]US2011033378 (DIMASI NAZZARENO [US], et al); | [A]US2012148580 (CHENNAMSETTY NARESH [US], et al); | [X]WO2013070565 (MEDIMMUNE LLC [US]); | [PX]WO2014124316 (IRM LLC [US], et al) |