EP3304134 - METHOD FOR ESTIMATING FAULTS IN A THREE-DIMENSIONAL SEISMIC IMAGE BLOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.04.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TotalEnergies OneTech La Défense 6 2 Place Jean Millier 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2022/27] |
Former [2020/41] | For all designated states TOTAL SE La Défense 6 2 Place Jean Millier 92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
Former [2018/15] | For all designated states Total S.A. 2, Place Jean Millier La Défense 6 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KESKES, Noomane c/o TOTAL SA 4 Allee Constance Bonacieux F-64000 Pau / FR | 02 /
SIBILLE, Georges 46 Chemin Salié F-64140 Lons / FR | [2018/15] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/36] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2018/15] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 15777996.8 | 01.06.2015 | [2018/15] | WO2015IB01056 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016193772 | Date: | 08.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3304134 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3304134 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01V1/30, G01V1/34, G01V99/00 | [2018/15] | CPC: |
G01V1/302 (EP,US);
G01V1/345 (EP,US);
G01V20/00 (EP,US);
G01V2210/642 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ABSCHÄTZUNG VON VERWERFUNGEN IN EINEM DREIDIMENSIONALEN SEISMISCHEN BILDBLOCK | [2022/16] | English: | METHOD FOR ESTIMATING FAULTS IN A THREE-DIMENSIONAL SEISMIC IMAGE BLOCK | [2018/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ESTIMATION DES FRACTURES DANS UN BLOCK D'IMAGE SISMIQUE À TROIS DIMENSIONS | [2022/15] |
Former [2018/15] | VERFAHREN ZUR SCHÄTZUNG VON FEHLERN IN EINEM BLOCK DREIDIMENSIONALER SEISMISCHER BILDER | ||
Former [2018/15] | PROCÉDÉ POUR ESTIMER DES DÉFAUTS DANS UN BLOC D'IMAGE SISMIQUE TRIDIMENSIONNEL | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 22.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 07.09.2022 | AT | 07.09.2022 | CZ | 07.09.2022 | DK | 07.09.2022 | EE | 07.09.2022 | ES | 07.09.2022 | FI | 07.09.2022 | HR | 07.09.2022 | LT | 07.09.2022 | LV | 07.09.2022 | MC | 07.09.2022 | PL | 07.09.2022 | RO | 07.09.2022 | RS | 07.09.2022 | SE | 07.09.2022 | SI | 07.09.2022 | SK | 07.09.2022 | SM | 07.09.2022 | GR | 08.12.2022 | IS | 07.01.2023 | PT | 09.01.2023 | IE | 01.06.2023 | LU | 01.06.2023 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/15] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
AT | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
DK | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
MC | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SI | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
LU | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
AT | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
DK | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
MC | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SI | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
AT | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
DK | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SI | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
AT | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
DK | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
AT | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 07.09.2022 | |
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 07.09.2022 | |
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 07.09.2022 | |
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 07.09.2022 | |
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 07.09.2022 | |
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 07.09.2022 | |
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 07.09.2022 | |
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2002198692 (MALLET JEAN-LAURENT [FR], et al) [X] 1,14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] - [0011] - [0 20] *; | [XI]WO2014083402 (TOTAL SA [FR]) [X] 1,14 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - line 5 * * page 2, line 22 - page 9, line 24 * * page 18, line 18 - page 19, line 14 * [I] 3-5,7-9,12; | [XI]US2014222403 (LEPAGE FRANCOIS [FR], et al) [X] 1,14 * paragraphs [0002] , [00 3] , [0 31] - [0038] - [0 52] - [0091] - [ 123]; figures 1, 3 * [I] 10,11; | [X]EP2778724 (PARADIGM SCIENCES LTD [KY], et al) [X] 1,2,6,13,14 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 2] , [0 47] - [0049] - [ 100] - [0102]; figure 2 *; | [A] - Massala, A. et al, "An Innovative Attribute for Enhancing Faults Lineaments and Sedimentary Features During 2G&R Interpretation", SPE Annual Technical Conference and Exhibition, 2013, doi:10.2118/166122-MS, (20130930), pages 1 - 20, URL: http://dx.doi.org/10.2118/166122-MS, (20160201), XP002753979 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2118/166122-MS |