EP3210307 - FULL DUPLEX RADIO WITH TX LEAKAGE CANCELLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Analog Devices International Unlimited Company Bay F1 Raheen Industrial Estate Limerick / IE | [2021/22] |
Former [2018/14] | For all designated states Analog Devices Global Unlimited Company 3rd Floor, Par La Ville Place 14 Par La Ville Road Hamilton / BM | ||
Former [2017/35] | For all designated states Analog Devices Global 3rd Floor, Par La Ville Place 14 Par La Ville Road Hamilton / BM | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRATT, Patrick Joseph Gort na Greig Upperquarterstown Mallow County Cork / IE | [2017/35] | Representative(s) | Wallin, Nicholas James Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/25] | Thompson, Andrew John Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2017/35] | Beck, Simon Antony Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 15778682.3 | 12.10.2015 | [2017/35] | WO2015EP73598 | Priority number, date | GB20140018814 | 22.10.2014 Original published format: GB 201418814 | US201514826316 | 14.08.2015 Original published format: US201514826316 | [2017/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016062576 | Date: | 28.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3210307 | Date: | 30.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3210307 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/525, H04B7/02, H04B7/06, H04L5/14, H04L25/00, H04W4/70 | [2018/45] | CPC: |
H04B1/525 (EP,CN,US);
H04B7/0617 (US);
H04L25/00 (US);
H04L5/1461 (US);
H04W4/70 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/35] | H04B1/525, H04B7/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VOLLDUPLEX-FUNKGERÄT MIT TX-LECK-UNTERDRÜCKUNG | [2017/35] | English: | FULL DUPLEX RADIO WITH TX LEAKAGE CANCELLATION | [2017/35] | French: | RADIO EN DUPLEX INTÉGRAL AVEC ANNULATION DE LA FUITE | [2017/35] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/35] | 18.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M06) [2018/45] | 04.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.10.2015 | AL | 23.06.2021 | AT | 23.06.2021 | CY | 23.06.2021 | CZ | 23.06.2021 | DK | 23.06.2021 | EE | 23.06.2021 | ES | 23.06.2021 | HR | 23.06.2021 | IT | 23.06.2021 | LT | 23.06.2021 | LV | 23.06.2021 | MC | 23.06.2021 | MK | 23.06.2021 | MT | 23.06.2021 | NL | 23.06.2021 | PL | 23.06.2021 | RO | 23.06.2021 | RS | 23.06.2021 | SI | 23.06.2021 | SK | 23.06.2021 | SM | 23.06.2021 | BG | 23.09.2021 | NO | 23.09.2021 | GR | 24.09.2021 | LU | 12.10.2021 | IS | 23.10.2021 | PT | 25.10.2021 | BE | 31.10.2021 | CH | 31.10.2021 | LI | 31.10.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 12.10.2015 | |
AL | 23.06.2021 | ||
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CY | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
IT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
MK | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
LU | 12.10.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 12.10.2015 | |
AL | 23.06.2021 | ||
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CY | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
IT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
LU | 12.10.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 12.10.2015 | |
AL | 23.06.2021 | ||
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
IT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
LU | 12.10.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
IT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
LU | 12.10.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
IT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
LU | 12.10.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
LU | 12.10.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | HR | 23.06.2021 | |
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | HR | 23.06.2021 | |
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | LT | 23.06.2021 | |
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | LT | 23.06.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2013294295 (VISWANATHAN NAGARAJAN [IN], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0011] - [0025]; figure 2 * [Y] 3-6 [I] 8,11,12; | [XYI]US2012201173 (JAIN MAYANK [US], et al) [X] 1,8,11 * paragraphs [0004] , [0025] , [0026] , [0067] , [0068]; figure 1 * [Y] 3-6 [I] 12,20; | [XAYI]WO2013095386 (INTEL CORP [US], et al) [X] 18 * paragraphs [0002] , [0019] - [0022] - [0032] , [0043]; figures 1,2 * [A] 4 [Y] 3,5,6,19 [I] 20; | [Y]US2008232268 (KAHRIZI MASOUD [US], et al) [Y] 19 * paragraphs [0041] - [0048]; figures 2-5 *; | [Y]US2013301487 (KHANDANI AMIR KEYVAN [CA]) [Y] 4,5 * paragraphs [0051] , [0052]; figure 4 *; | [XYI]US2013155913 (SARCA OCTAVIAN [CA]) [X] 1,2,8 * figures 1-6 * [Y] 3-6 [I] 11,12; | [XYI]US2013089009 (LI LI ERRAN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8,11 * paragraphs [0054] - [0070]; figures 2,3A,3B * [Y] 3-6 [I] 12 | Examination | US2009186582 | US2013155913 | US2014269858 |