EP3209157 - DISPENSER FOR A CREAM, GEL OR SOFT SOLID COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] | Applicant(s) | For:CY
GB
IE
MT
Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London, Greater London EC4Y 0DY / GB | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Unilever NV Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [2017/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BILTON, Simon Lewis 47 Wathen Road Leamington Spa Warwickshire CV32 5UY / GB | 02 /
JONES, Christopher John The Old Thatch Grafton Tewkesbury Gloucestershire GL20 7AT / GB | 03 /
NELSON, Rebecca Anne 11 Victoria Road Leamington Spa Warwickshire CV31 3PX / GB | 04 /
OGLESBY, Benjamin George Unilever UK Limited Coal Road Seacroft Leeds Yorkshire LS14 2AR / GB | 05 /
THOMPSON, Guy Richard Unilever R&D Port Sunlight Quarry Road East Bebington Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | 06 /
WEDDELL, Iain Andrew Unilever R&D Port Sunlight Quarry Road East Bebington Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | [2017/35] | Representative(s) | Whaley, Christopher, et al Unilever PLC Unilever Patent Group Bronland 14 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2017/35] | Whaley, Christopher, et al Unilever PLC Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford, Bedfordshire MK44 1LQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15778972.8 | 13.10.2015 | [2017/35] | WO2015EP73699 | Priority number, date | EP20140190349 | 24.10.2014 Original published format: EP 14190349 | [2017/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016062584 | Date: | 28.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3209157 | Date: | 30.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3209157 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A45D34/04, A45D40/04, B05C17/01, B65D83/00, G01F11/02, B05C17/005 | [2017/35] | CPC: |
B65D83/0038 (EP,US);
A45D34/04 (EP,US);
B05C17/012 (US);
G01F11/021 (EP,US);
B05C17/00576 (EP,US);
B05C17/0133 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPENDER FÜR EINE CREME, EIN GEL ODER EINE WEICHE FESTSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2017/35] | English: | DISPENSER FOR A CREAM, GEL OR SOFT SOLID COMPOSITION | [2017/35] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR POUR CRÈME, GEL OU COMPOSITION SOLIDE MOLLE | [2017/35] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/35] | 28.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.10.2015 | AL | 18.04.2018 | AT | 18.04.2018 | CY | 18.04.2018 | CZ | 18.04.2018 | DK | 18.04.2018 | EE | 18.04.2018 | ES | 18.04.2018 | FI | 18.04.2018 | HR | 18.04.2018 | IT | 18.04.2018 | LT | 18.04.2018 | LV | 18.04.2018 | MC | 18.04.2018 | MK | 18.04.2018 | NL | 18.04.2018 | PL | 18.04.2018 | RO | 18.04.2018 | RS | 18.04.2018 | SE | 18.04.2018 | SK | 18.04.2018 | SM | 18.04.2018 | TR | 18.04.2018 | BG | 18.07.2018 | NO | 18.07.2018 | GR | 19.07.2018 | IS | 18.08.2018 | PT | 20.08.2018 | IE | 13.10.2018 | LU | 13.10.2018 | MT | 13.10.2018 | SI | 13.10.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | CH | 31.10.2018 | FR | 31.10.2018 | LI | 31.10.2018 | [2021/01] |
Former [2020/32] | HU | 13.10.2015 | |
AL | 18.04.2018 | ||
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CY | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
MK | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
TR | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
IS | 18.08.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
IE | 13.10.2018 | ||
LU | 13.10.2018 | ||
MT | 13.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/31] | HU | 13.10.2015 | |
AL | 18.04.2018 | ||
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CY | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
MK | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
TR | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
IE | 13.10.2018 | ||
LU | 13.10.2018 | ||
MT | 13.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
TR | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
IE | 13.10.2018 | ||
LU | 13.10.2018 | ||
MT | 13.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
IE | 13.10.2018 | ||
LU | 13.10.2018 | ||
MT | 13.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
IE | 13.10.2018 | ||
LU | 13.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
LU | 13.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
LU | 13.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
LU | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | NL | 18.04.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0312165 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [Y]US5255990 (DORNBUSCH ARTHUR H [US], et al) [Y] 1,3-5,10,20-23 * abstract * * column 2, lines 53-68 - page 3, lines 1-13 * * column 4, lines 1-18 - column 6 * * column 7 *; | [A]WO2010081205 (ESTEVE VICTOR [BR], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [Y]GB2472412 (TWISTUB LTD [GB]) [Y] 1,3,5,10,20,23 * abstract * * page 1, line l * * page 2, paragraphs 1,3 - page 4, paragraph 1 * * page 5, paragraphs 2,3 - page 7, paragraph 2 *; | [YD]WO2012131320 (LEO PHARMA AS [DK], et al) [YD] 1,3-5,10,20-23 * page 3, lines 4-15 - page 12, lines 28-33; figures 1-20 * * page 13, lines 1-18 - page 14, lines 6-25 * * page 53, line 4 * * page 5, paragraph l * |