EP3198975 - SHARED SPECTRUM OPERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2017/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BHUSHAN, Naga Qualcomm Incorporated Attn: International Ip Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
SMEE, John, Edward Qualcomm Incorporated Attn: International Ip Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
JI, Tingfang Qualcomm Incorporated Attn: International Ip Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
SADEK, Ahmed, Kamel Qualcomm Incorporated Attn: International Ip Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
MUKKAVILLI, Krishna, Kiran Qualcomm Incorporated Attn: International Ip Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 06 /
SORIAGA, Joseph, Binamira Qualcomm Incorporated Attn: International Ip Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2019/28] |
Former [2017/31] | 01 /
BHUSHAN, Naga Qualcomm Incorporated Attn: International Ip Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | ||
02 /
SMEE, John, Edward Qualcomm Incorporated Attn: International Ip Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | |||
03 /
JI, Tingfang Qualcomm Incorporated Attn: International Ip Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | |||
04 /
SADEK, Ahmed, Kamel Qualcomm Incorporated Attn: International Ip Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | |||
05 /
MUKKAVILLI, Krishna Qualcomm Incorporated Attn: International Ip Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | |||
06 /
SORIAGA, Joseph, Binamira Qualcomm Incorporated Attn: International Ip Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | Representative(s) | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2017/31] | Application number, filing date | 15779057.7 | 15.09.2015 | [2017/31] | WO2015US50167 | Priority number, date | US201462056266P | 26.09.2014 Original published format: US 201462056266 P | US201514853186 | 14.09.2015 Original published format: US201514853186 | [2017/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016048712 | Date: | 31.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3198975 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3198975 | Date: | 10.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/08, H04W16/14, H04W74/00 | [2017/31] | CPC: |
H04W74/0808 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W16/14 (CN,KR,US);
H04W84/042 (KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BETRIEB MIT GETEILTEM SPEKTRUM | [2017/31] | English: | SHARED SPECTRUM OPERATION | [2017/31] | French: | OPÉRATION DE SPECTRE PARTAGÉ | [2017/31] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/31] | 01.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Request for further processing for: | 06.02.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 06.02.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.02.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.09.2015 | AL | 10.07.2019 | AT | 10.07.2019 | CY | 10.07.2019 | CZ | 10.07.2019 | DK | 10.07.2019 | EE | 10.07.2019 | ES | 10.07.2019 | FI | 10.07.2019 | HR | 10.07.2019 | IT | 10.07.2019 | LT | 10.07.2019 | LV | 10.07.2019 | MC | 10.07.2019 | MK | 10.07.2019 | MT | 10.07.2019 | NL | 10.07.2019 | PL | 10.07.2019 | RO | 10.07.2019 | RS | 10.07.2019 | SE | 10.07.2019 | SI | 10.07.2019 | SK | 10.07.2019 | SM | 10.07.2019 | TR | 10.07.2019 | IE | 15.09.2019 | LU | 15.09.2019 | BE | 30.09.2019 | CH | 30.09.2019 | LI | 30.09.2019 | BG | 10.10.2019 | NO | 10.10.2019 | GR | 11.10.2019 | IS | 10.11.2019 | PT | 11.11.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 15.09.2015 | |
AL | 10.07.2019 | ||
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CY | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
MT | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IE | 15.09.2019 | ||
LU | 15.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 15.09.2015 | |
AL | 10.07.2019 | ||
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CY | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IE | 15.09.2019 | ||
LU | 15.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CY | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IE | 15.09.2019 | ||
LU | 15.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IE | 15.09.2019 | ||
LU | 15.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IE | 15.09.2019 | ||
LU | 15.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LU | 15.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 10.07.2019 | |
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 10.07.2019 | |
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | NL | 10.07.2019 | Cited in | International search | [I]EP2094052 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [I] 1-12,17-27 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0070]; figures 1-9 *; | [XY]US2014080535 (GAUVREAU JEAN-LOUIS [CA], et al) [X] 13,28 * paragraph [0193] - paragraph [0198] * [Y] 14-16,29,30; | [YA] - PAISANA FRANCISCO ET AL, "Radar, TV and Cellular Bands: Which Spectrum Access Techniques for Which Bands?", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS SURVEYS & TUTORIALS, IEEE, USA, (20140701), vol. 16, no. 3, doi:10.1109/SURV.2014.031914.00078, pages 1193 - 1220, XP011557068 [Y] 14-16,29,30 * paragraphs [III.D] , [ IV.F] , [ V.C] * * paragraph [III.A] - paragraph [III.D] * [A] 1-12,17-27 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SURV.2014.031914.00078 |