EP2981232 - NASAL DILATOR WITH ELASTIC MEMBRANE STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.08.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2023 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Horizon IP Tech, LLC 711 Kapiolani Boulevard Suite 1000 Honolulu, HI 96813 / US | [2023/12] |
Former [2016/06] | For all designated states Ierulli, Joseph V. 2225 E. Fifth Street Unit 118 Vancouver, Washington 98661 / US | ||
For all designated states Sinda, Edmund A. 300 Sarasota Center Blvd. Sarasota, Florida 34240 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ierulli, Joseph V. Vancouver, WA 98661 / US | 02 /
Sinda, Edmund A. Sarasota, FL 34240 / US | [2023/12] |
Former [2016/06] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Stanley, David William Stanleys Intellectual Property Suite LP44050 20-22 Wenlock Road London, N1 7GU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/06] | Dickerson, David Gartenstrasse 51 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 15779831.5 | 08.04.2015 | [2016/06] | WO2015IB52565 | Priority number, date | US201461980814P | 17.04.2014 Original published format: US 201461980814 P | US201514677897 | 02.04.2015 Original published format: US201514677897 | [2016/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015159186 | Date: | 22.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2981232 | Date: | 10.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 22.10.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/08 | [2016/06] | CPC: |
A61F5/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/06] | Title | German: | NASALER DILATOR MIT ELASTISCHER MEMBRANSTRUKTUR | [2016/06] | English: | NASAL DILATOR WITH ELASTIC MEMBRANE STRUCTURE | [2016/06] | French: | DILATATEUR NASAL AVEC STRUCTURE DE MEMBRANE ÉLASTIQUE | [2016/06] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2015 | Search fee paid | 06.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/06] | 14.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.10.2021 | 18.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 27.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5890486 (MITRA SEKHAR [CN], et al) [A] 1-14* column 5, line 57 - column 8, line 29; figure 2 *; | [XAY]EP1033118 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1-11,13,14 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0029] * [A] 12 [Y] 10; | [Y]US2008184995 (IERULLI JOSEPH V [US]) [Y] 10 * figures 15,16 * | International search | [X]US2011000483 (MATTHIAS JOSEPH A [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * , paragraphs [0034]-[0035], [0037], [0054], [0057]-[0059], claims, fig. 1-9, 15-21 *; | [X]US2011166594 (EULL PATRICIA A [US], et al) [X] 17-18* , [0028]-[0035], claims, fig. 1, 4 * |