EP3042472 - METHOD FOR SUPERVISING A FIRST STATION IN A COMMUNICATION NETWORK AND SUPERVISING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/28] | METHOD FOR MONITORING A FIRST PARTICIPANT IN A COMMUNICATION NETWORK, AND MONITORING SYSTEM | ||
[2017/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2018 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beckhoff Automation GmbH Eiserstrasse 5 33415 Verl / DE | [2016/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELLERBROCK, Oliver Siedlungsstraße 14 32602 Vlotho / DE | 02 /
SACHS, Jens Auf dem Ufer 8 32469 Petershagen Lahde / DE | 03 /
ZUTZ, Robert Kiefernweg 9 33415 Verl Kaunitz / DE | [2016/28] | Representative(s) | Patentanwaltskanzlei WILHELM & BECK Prinzenstraße 13 80639 München / DE | [2016/28] | Application number, filing date | 15781338.7 | 14.10.2015 | [2016/28] | WO2015EP73758 | Priority number, date | DE201410114883 | 14.10.2014 Original published format: DE102014114883 | [2016/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016059100 | Date: | 21.04.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3042472 | Date: | 13.07.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3042472 | Date: | 31.05.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24, G06F11/07, H04J3/06, // H04L12/26 | [2017/03] | CPC: |
H04L43/106 (EP,US);
H04J3/0664 (EP,CN,US);
H04L43/0823 (US);
G06F11/0724 (EP,US);
G06F11/0757 (EP,US);
H04L41/0695 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/28] | H04L12/26, G06F11/07, H04J3/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ÜBERWACHEN EINES ERSTEN TEILNEHMERS IN EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERK UND ÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM | [2016/28] | English: | METHOD FOR SUPERVISING A FIRST STATION IN A COMMUNICATION NETWORK AND SUPERVISING SYSTEM | [2017/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SURVEILLANCE D'UNE STATION DANS UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION ET SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE | [2017/04] |
Former [2016/28] | METHOD FOR MONITORING A FIRST PARTICIPANT IN A COMMUNICATION NETWORK, AND MONITORING SYSTEM | ||
Former [2016/28] | PROCÉDÉ DE SURVEILLANCE D'UN PREMIER UTILISATEUR D'UN PREMIER RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION ET SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/28] | 03.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/19] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.10.2015 | AL | 31.05.2017 | CY | 31.05.2017 | CZ | 31.05.2017 | DK | 31.05.2017 | EE | 31.05.2017 | ES | 31.05.2017 | FI | 31.05.2017 | HR | 31.05.2017 | LT | 31.05.2017 | LV | 31.05.2017 | MC | 31.05.2017 | MK | 31.05.2017 | MT | 31.05.2017 | NL | 31.05.2017 | PL | 31.05.2017 | PT | 31.05.2017 | RO | 31.05.2017 | RS | 31.05.2017 | SE | 31.05.2017 | SI | 31.05.2017 | SK | 31.05.2017 | SM | 31.05.2017 | TR | 31.05.2017 | BG | 31.08.2017 | NO | 31.08.2017 | GR | 01.09.2017 | IS | 30.09.2017 | IE | 14.10.2017 | LU | 14.10.2017 | BE | 31.10.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 14.10.2015 | |
CY | 31.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
MK | 31.05.2017 | ||
MT | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PT | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
TR | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 14.10.2017 | ||
LU | 14.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 14.10.2015 | |
CY | 31.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
MK | 31.05.2017 | ||
MT | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
TR | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 14.10.2017 | ||
LU | 14.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 14.10.2015 | |
CY | 31.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
MK | 31.05.2017 | ||
MT | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 14.10.2017 | ||
LU | 14.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 14.10.2015 | |
CY | 31.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
MT | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 14.10.2017 | ||
LU | 14.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/41] | HU | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
MT | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 14.10.2017 | ||
LU | 14.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
MT | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 14.10.2017 | ||
LU | 14.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CZ | 31.05.2017 | |
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
MT | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 14.10.2017 | ||
LU | 14.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 31.05.2017 | |
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
MT | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
LU | 14.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CZ | 31.05.2017 | |
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
LU | 14.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | CZ | 31.05.2017 | |
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 31.05.2017 | |
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 31.05.2017 | |
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | DK | 31.05.2017 | |
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | ES | 31.05.2017 | |
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | ES | 31.05.2017 | |
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | ES | 31.05.2017 | |
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE10361178 (ROCKWELL AUTOMATION TECH INC [US]) [AD] 1-8 * figures 1,6 * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0056] *; | [A]DE102008007672 (PILZ GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-8 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0062] *; | [A]WO2013094072 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,5 * abstract *; | [P]EP2797263 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [P] * abstract *; | [A] - "Grundsatz für die Prüfung und Zertifizierung von Bussystemen für die Übertragung sicherheitsrelevanter Nachrichten", INTERNET CITATION, (20020531), pages 1 - 34, URL: http://www.bgete.de/bilder/pdf/gs-et-26_a05-2002.pdf, (20090403), XP002522879 [A] 1-8 * paragraph [2.4.1] * * paragraph [2.4.4] * * paragraph [03.2] * * paragraph [3.6.2] * |