EP3134528 - MULTIPLE TARGETED RNAI FOR THE TREATMENT OF CANCERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.09.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Strike Bio, Inc. 2001 Bryan Street, Suite 2050 Dallas, TX 75201 / US | For all designated states Baylor College of Medicine One Baylor Plaza Houston, TX 77030 / US | [2017/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAO, Donald 3355 Blackburn Street Apt. 3307 Dallas, TX 75204 / US | 02 /
NEMUNAITIS, John 1136 Mallard Pointe Drive Cedar Hill, TX 75104-6911 / US | 03 /
O'MALLEY, Bert, W. 6602 Brompton Road Houston, TX 77005 / US | 04 /
LONARD, David 12603 Bethany Bay Drive Pearland, TX 77584 / US | [2017/11] |
Former [2017/09] | 01 /
RAO, Donald 3355 Blackburn Street Dallas, TX 75204 / US | ||
02 /
NEMUNAITIS, John 1136 Mallard Pointe Drive Cedar Hill, TX 75104-6911 / US | |||
03 /
O'MALLEY, Bert, W. 6602 Brompton Road Houston, TX 77005 / US | |||
04 /
LONARD, David 12603 Bethany Bay Drive Pearland, TX 77584 / US | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/09] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 15783597.6 | 24.04.2015 | [2017/09] | WO2015US27638 | Priority number, date | US201461984614P | 25.04.2014 Original published format: US 201461984614 P | [2017/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015164818 | Date: | 29.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3134528 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 29.10.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/113, A61K48/00, C12N5/10 | [2017/09] | CPC: |
C12N15/1135 (EP,US);
A61K31/7088 (EP,US);
A61K31/7105 (EP);
A61K31/713 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
C12N15/1138 (EP);
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
G01N33/5011 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP);
A61K9/127 (EP);
C12N2310/14 (EP,US);
C12N2310/51 (EP);
C12N2310/531 (EP,US);
C12N2320/31 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/136 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/7105, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/713, A61K2300/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/09] | Title | German: | MEHRFACH ANGEZIELTE RNAI ZUR KREBSBEHANDLUNG | [2017/09] | English: | MULTIPLE TARGETED RNAI FOR THE TREATMENT OF CANCERS | [2017/09] | French: | ARNI À CIBLES MULTIPLES PERMETTANT LE TRAITEMENT DE CANCERS | [2017/09] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2016 | Search fee paid | 10.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/09] | 10.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.06.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2013148824 (GRADALIS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,4-8,11,13-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2013259926 (RAO DONALD [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2013170071 (GRADALIS INC [US]) [Y] 1,2,4-8,11,13-15 * the whole document *; | [A] - RAO DONALD D ET AL, "Bifunctional short hairpin RNA (bi-shRNA): design and pathway to clinical application.", METHODS IN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY (CLIFTON, N.J.), (2013), vol. 942, ISSN 1940-6029, pages 259 - 278, XP009501123 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-1-62703-119-6_14 | [XOP] - LONARD DAVID M ET AL, "Preclinical Evaluation of Triple Oncogene-Targeting Bifunctional Small Hairpin RNAs Designed To Simultaneously Target Steroid Receptor Coactivator-3 (SRC-3), EGFR and KRAS", MOLECULAR THERAPY, (201405), vol. 22, no. Suppl.1, ISSN 1525-0016, page S255, XP009187241 [XOP] 1-15 * abstract * | International search | [A]US2013064881 (NEMUNAITIS JOHN J [US], et al) [A] 1-35; | [A]US2013266639 (RAO DONALD [US], et al) [A] 1-35; | [A]US2012142764 (SEOL DAI-WU [KR]) [A] 1-35 |