EP3204248 - VEHICLE HAVING SUSPENSION WITH CONTINUOUS DAMPING CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.2019 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polaris Industries Inc. 2100 Highway 55 Medina, MN 55340 / US | [2017/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRADY, Louis J. 25724 Goldfinch Avenue Wyoming, Minnesota 55092 / US | 02 /
SCHEUERELL, Alex R. 1999 Webber Street White Bear Lake, Minnesota 55110 / US | 03 /
FRANKER, Steven R. 7278 378th Street North Branch, Minnesota 55056 / US | 04 /
NYSSE, Aaron J. 31945 Forest Boulevard Stacy, Minnesota 55079 / US | [2017/33] | Representative(s) | reuteler & cie SA Chemin de la Vuarpillière 29 1260 Nyon / CH | [2017/33] | Application number, filing date | 15784219.6 | 06.10.2015 | [2017/33] | WO2015US54296 | Priority number, date | US201414507355 | 06.10.2014 Original published format: US201414507355 | [2017/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016057555 | Date: | 14.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3204248 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B60G17/06, B60G17/08, B60G17/018, B60G17/016 | [2017/33] | CPC: |
B60G17/06 (EP,CN);
B60G17/0164 (EP,CN);
B60G17/0162 (EP,CN);
B60G17/018 (EP,CN);
B60G17/08 (EP,CN);
B60G2300/07 (EP,CN);
B60G2300/32 (EP,CN);
B60G2300/322 (EP,CN);
B60G2400/102 (EP,CN);
B60G2400/204 (EP,CN);
B60G2400/33 (EP,CN);
B60G2400/39 (EP,CN);
B60G2400/40 (EP,CN);
B60G2400/61 (EP,CN);
B60G2500/10 (EP,CN);
B60G2600/02 (EP,CN);
B60G2600/04 (EP,CN);
B60G2600/20 (EP,CN);
B60G2600/70 (EP,CN);
B60G2800/014 (EP,CN);
B60G2800/162 (EP,CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/33] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUG MIT AUFHÄNGUNG MIT KONTINUIERLICHER DÄMPFUNGSSTEUERUNG | [2017/33] | English: | VEHICLE HAVING SUSPENSION WITH CONTINUOUS DAMPING CONTROL | [2017/33] | French: | VÉHICULE COMPRENANT UNE SUSPENSION À COMMANDE D'AMORTISSEMENT CONTINUE | [2017/33] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/33] | 28.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2018 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 22.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/48] | 12.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/48] | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Claims | 24.01.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 24.01.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.02.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5080392 (BAZERGUI CLAUDE [CA]) [A] 1-23* the whole document *; | [A]US2014125018 (BRADY LOUIS JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * the whole document * | by applicant | US7950486 | - CAUSEMANN, PETER, Automotive Shock Absorbers: Features, Designs, Applications, VERL. MODEME INDUSTRIE, (2001), pages 53 - 63 |