EP3188828 - A METHOD OF TREATING A ZEOLITE WITH AN ALUMINUM COMPOUND TO PREPARE A CATALYST FOR THE PRODUCTION OF AROMATICS AND THE CATALYST MADE THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SABIC Global Technologies B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2017/28] | For all designated states SABIC Global Technologies B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALMUTAIRI, Sami Muteib P.O. Box 5101 Riyadh 11422 / SA | 02 /
CHAUDHARY, Labeeb A. P.O. Box 5101 Riyadh 11422 / SA | 03 /
MUSSA, Majed Mohammed P.O. Box 5101 Riyadh 11422 / SA | 04 /
VYAS, Mayank Harishbhai P.O. Box 5101 Riyadh 11422 / SA | [2017/28] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/28] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners (DE) Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15784467.1 | 02.09.2015 | [2017/28] | WO2015IB56664 | Priority number, date | US201462045229P | 03.09.2014 Original published format: US 201462045229 P | [2017/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016035025 | Date: | 10.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3188828 | Date: | 12.07.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B01J21/04, B01J29/40, B01J29/44, B01J29/46, B01J29/48, C07C2/00 | [2017/28] | CPC: |
B01J29/40 (EP,US);
B01J21/04 (EP,US);
B01J29/068 (US);
B01J29/072 (US);
B01J29/076 (US);
B01J29/44 (EP,US);
B01J29/46 (EP,US);
B01J29/48 (EP,US);
C07C2/76 (EP,US);
C10G45/68 (EP,US);
C10G50/00 (EP,US);
B01J2229/10 (EP,US);
B01J2229/18 (EP,US);
B01J2229/186 (EP,US);
C07C2521/08 (EP,US);
C07C2529/40 (EP,US);
C10G2300/1025 (EP,US);
C10G2300/1081 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C2/76, C07C15/02 (US,EP);
C07C2/76, C07C15/04 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/28] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ZEOLITH MIT EINER ALUMINIUMVERBINDUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KATALYSATORS ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON AROMATISCHEN KOHLENWASSERSTOFFEN UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTER KATALYSATOR | [2017/28] | English: | A METHOD OF TREATING A ZEOLITE WITH AN ALUMINUM COMPOUND TO PREPARE A CATALYST FOR THE PRODUCTION OF AROMATICS AND THE CATALYST MADE THEREFROM | [2017/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'UNE ZÉOLITHE AVEC UN COMPOSÉ D'ALUMINIUM AUX FINS DE PRÉPARATION D'UN CATALYSEUR DESTINÉ À LA PRODUCTION D'AROMATIQUES, ET CATALYSEUR OBTENU SELON CE PROCÉDÉ | [2017/28] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/28] | 17.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/37] | 09.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5512267 (DAVIS MARK E [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * example 9; claim - *; | [X]US2003133870 (CHEN CONG-YAN [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * example -; claim - *; | [I]US2011054232 (SANGAR NEERAJ [US], et al) [I] 16-20* example -; claim - *; | [X] - MASAYA MATSUOKA ET AL, "Preparation and Characterization of Pt/Al-ZSM-5 Catalysts and their Reactivities for the Oxidation of CO with N2O at Low Temperatures", CATALYSIS LETTERS, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS-PLENUM PUBLISHERS, NE, (20050801), vol. 102, no. 3-4, ISSN 1572-879X, pages 149 - 152, XP019275196 [X] 1-15 * experimental * | by applicant | US3702886 |