EP3137019 - ACETABULAR CUP IMPACTING USING PATIENT-SPECIFIC INSTRUMENTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zimmer, Inc. P.O. Box 708 1800 W. Center Street Warsaw, Indiana 46581-0708 / US | [2017/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANSEN, Herbert, Andre 5127 De Bordeaux Montreal QC, 424 2A6 / CA | 02 /
LI, Di 6973 Rue Marie-guyart Lasalle Qc, H8N 3G9 / CA | 03 /
DUVAL, Karine 2486 Sherbrooke Street E. Apt. 2 Montreal Qc, H3C 2N6 / CA | 04 /
FALARDEAU, Bruno 75 Queen Street Montreal Qc, H3C 2N6 / CA | 05 /
PARADIS, François 214 De Chartres Boucherville Qc, J4B 7V1 / CA | 06 /
PELLETIER, Benoit 96, 7e Rue Laval Qc, H7N 2C7 / CA | [2019/12] |
Former [2017/10] | 01 /
JANSEN, Herbert, Andre 5127 De Bordeaux Montreal, QC 424 2A6 / CA | ||
02 /
LI, Di 6973 Rue Marie-Guyart Lasalle, QC H8N 3G9 / CA | |||
03 /
DUVAL, Karine 2486 Sherbrooke Street E. Apt. 2 Montreal, QC H3C 2N6 / CA | |||
04 /
FALARDEAU, Bruno 75 Queen Street Montreal, QC H3C 2N6 / CA | |||
05 /
PARADIS, Francois 214 De Chartres Boucherville, QC J4B 7V1 / CA | |||
06 /
PELLETIER, Benoit 96 7e Rue Laval, QC H7N 2C7 / CA | Representative(s) | Mays, Julie, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London, EC1A 4HD / GB | [2017/10] | Application number, filing date | 15785262.5 | 30.04.2015 | [2017/10] | WO2015US28534 | Priority number, date | US201461986515P | 30.04.2014 Original published format: US 201461986515 P | [2017/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015168415 | Date: | 05.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3137019 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3137019 | Date: | 20.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.11.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/46 | [2017/10] | CPC: |
A61B90/11 (EP,US);
A61B90/13 (EP,US);
A61B90/30 (EP,US);
A61F2/4609 (EP,US);
A61B2090/395 (EP,US);
A61F2/30942 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4629 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4681 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4687 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4696 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENPRESSUNG EINER HÜFTGELENKPFANNE AUF GRUNDLAGE VON PATIENTENSPEZIFISCHEN INSTRUMENTEN | [2017/10] | English: | ACETABULAR CUP IMPACTING USING PATIENT-SPECIFIC INSTRUMENTATION | [2017/10] | French: | IMPACTION DE COTYLE AU MOYEN D'INSTRUMENTS SPÉCIFIQUES DU PATIENT | [2017/10] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2016 | Search fee paid | 30.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/10] | 30.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 16.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 06.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/09] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 06.02.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 06.02.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.02.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.04.2015 | AL | 20.03.2019 | AT | 20.03.2019 | CY | 20.03.2019 | CZ | 20.03.2019 | DK | 20.03.2019 | EE | 20.03.2019 | ES | 20.03.2019 | FI | 20.03.2019 | HR | 20.03.2019 | IT | 20.03.2019 | LT | 20.03.2019 | LV | 20.03.2019 | MC | 20.03.2019 | MK | 20.03.2019 | MT | 20.03.2019 | NL | 20.03.2019 | PL | 20.03.2019 | RO | 20.03.2019 | RS | 20.03.2019 | SE | 20.03.2019 | SI | 20.03.2019 | SK | 20.03.2019 | SM | 20.03.2019 | TR | 20.03.2019 | BE | 30.04.2019 | LU | 30.04.2019 | BG | 20.06.2019 | NO | 20.06.2019 | GR | 21.06.2019 | IS | 20.07.2019 | PT | 20.07.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 30.04.2015 | |
AL | 20.03.2019 | ||
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CY | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
MT | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
LU | 30.04.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 30.04.2015 | |
AL | 20.03.2019 | ||
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CY | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
LU | 30.04.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CY | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
LU | 30.04.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
LU | 30.04.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
LU | 30.04.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
LU | 30.04.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
LU | 30.04.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
LU | 30.04.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 20.03.2019 | |
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 20.03.2019 | |
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004073225 (SUBBA RAO GOLI V [US]) [X] 1,6 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0069] * * figures 1,5,9,10 *; | [X]US2009099665 (TAYLOR ANDREW CLIVE [GB], et al) [X] 1,5 * paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0095] ** figure 16 *; | [XA]US2011190775 (URE KEITH J [US]) [X] 1,5,7,8,10,12,13 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0031] * * figures 1,3,4 * [A] 2-4,9,11; | [X]US2014031722 (LI DI [CA], et al) [X] 1,5 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0040] * * figures 1,3 * | International search | [Y]US2006100504 (JANSEN HERBERT A [CA], et al) [Y] 12 * entire document *; | [Y]US2010076505 (BORJA SANTIAGO P [US]) [Y] 5-7, 11, 21, 24 * entire document *; | [A]US2010249657 (NYCZ JEFFREY H [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * entire document *; | [XY]US2012226283 (MERIDEW JASON D [US], et al) [X] 1-4, 8-10, 13-20, 22-23, 25 * entire document * [Y] 5-7, 11-12, 21, 24; | [A]US2013053856 (PENENBERG BRAD L [US]) [A] 1-25* entire document * |