EP3137084 - BENZYL AMILORIDE FOR THE TREATMENT OF PSORIASIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/10] | EPITHELIAL ION CHANNEL (ENAC) BLOCKERS TO TREAT PSORIASIS | ||
[2019/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.10.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.10.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University Office of the General Counsel Building 170, Third Floor, Main Quad P.O. Box 20386 Stanford, CA 94305-2038 / US | For all designated states U.S. Government Represented by the Department of Veteran Affairs 810 Vermont Avenue NW Washington DC 20420 / US | [2019/38] |
Former [2017/48] | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University Office of the General Counsel Building 170, 3rd Floor, Main Quad P.O. Box 20386 Stanford, CA 94305-2038 / US | ||
For all designated states U.S. Government Represented by the Department of Veteran Affairs 810 Vermont Avenue NW Washington DC 20420 / US | |||
Former [2017/10] | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University Office of the General Counsel Building 170, 3rd Floor, Main Quad P.O. Box 20386 Stanford, CA 94305-2038 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARINKOVICH, Peter M. 43 Woodhill Drive Redwood City, California 94061 / US | 02 /
BUTTE, Atul J. 2020 Monterey Avenue Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | 03 /
NASRALLAH, Mazen 109 Thorndike Street Cambridge, MA 02141 / US | 04 /
WINGE, Carl Gustaf Maarten 2011 California Street Apt. 14A Mountain View, California 94040 / US | [2017/10] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/52] | Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | ||
Former [2017/10] | Sutcliffe, Nicholas Robert, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 15786354.9 | 01.05.2015 | [2017/10] | WO2015US28820 | Priority number, date | US201461987691P | 02.05.2014 Original published format: US 201461987691 P | [2017/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015168574 | Date: | 05.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3137084 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3137084 | Date: | 25.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.11.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4965, A61K45/06, A61P17/06 | [2017/51] | CPC: |
A61K31/4965 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4965, A61K2300/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2017/10] | A61K31/4965 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BENZYL AMILORID ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON PSORIASIS | [2019/28] | English: | BENZYL AMILORIDE FOR THE TREATMENT OF PSORIASIS | [2019/28] | French: | AMILORIDE DE BENZYLE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU PSORIASIS | [2019/28] |
Former [2017/10] | EPITHELIALE IONENKANALBLOCKER ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON PSORIASIS | ||
Former [2017/10] | EPITHELIAL ION CHANNEL (ENAC) BLOCKERS TO TREAT PSORIASIS | ||
Former [2017/10] | INHIBITEURS DES CANAUX SODIQUES ÉPITHÉLIAUX (ENAC) POUR TRAITER LE PSORIASIS | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2016 | Search fee paid | 10.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/10] | 27.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.05.2015 | AL | 25.12.2019 | AT | 25.12.2019 | CY | 25.12.2019 | CZ | 25.12.2019 | DK | 25.12.2019 | EE | 25.12.2019 | ES | 25.12.2019 | FI | 25.12.2019 | HR | 25.12.2019 | IT | 25.12.2019 | LT | 25.12.2019 | LV | 25.12.2019 | MK | 25.12.2019 | NL | 25.12.2019 | PL | 25.12.2019 | RO | 25.12.2019 | RS | 25.12.2019 | SE | 25.12.2019 | SI | 25.12.2019 | SK | 25.12.2019 | SM | 25.12.2019 | TR | 25.12.2019 | BG | 25.03.2020 | NO | 25.03.2020 | GR | 26.03.2020 | IS | 25.04.2020 | PT | 20.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 01.05.2015 | |
AL | 25.12.2019 | ||
AT | 25.12.2019 | ||
CY | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
IT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
TR | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
AT | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
IT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 25.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO02085367 (UAB RESEARCH FOUNDATION [US]) [X] 9,10 * example - *; | [X]JP2006232684 (QUALITAS KK, et al) [X] 9,11 * abstract *; | [X]US2014011817 (XIONG ZHIGANG [US], et al) [X] 9,12 * claims 37,38 *; | [A] - RAHMAN M ET AL, "Classical to current approach for treatment of psoriasis: a review", ENDOCRINE, METABOLIC & IMMUNE DISORDERS - DRUG TARGETS, BENTHAM SCIENCE PUBLISHERS LTD, BUSSUM, NL, (20120901), vol. 12, no. 3, doi:10.2174/187153012802002901, ISSN 1871-5303, pages 287 - 302, XP002742331 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/187153012802002901 | [A] - SIMONA FRATESCHI ET AL, "The Epithelial Sodium Channel ENaC and its Regulators in the Epidermal Permeability Barrier Function", THE OPEN DERMATOLOGY JOURNAL, NL, (20100101), vol. 4, no. 1, doi:10.2174/1874372201004010027, ISSN 1874-3722, pages 27 - 35, XP055422684 [A] 1-8 * page 28, column r - page 32 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/1874372201004010027 | International search | [Y]US6264975 (BOUCHER JR RICHARD C [US]) [Y] 2, 3 * entire document *; | [A]US2004087480 (RANE STANLEY G [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * entire document *; | [A]US6903105 (JOHNSON MICHAEL R [US]) [A] 1-12* entire document *; | [XY]US2006127318 (LIEDTKE RAINER K [DE]) [X] 1, 5-7, 9, 11 * entire document * [Y] 2, 3, 8, 10; | [A]US2007161543 (YU RUEY J [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * entire document *; | [Y]US2011280845 (EDINGER JAMES W [US], et al) [Y] 8, 10 * entire document * |