EP3137259 - INTERRUPTED STRUCTURED ABRASIVE ARTICLE AND METHODS OF POLISHING A WORKPIECE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2017/10] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAGLIARDI, John J. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
ROMERO, Vincent D. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
COAD, Eric C. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2017/10] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/10] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15786533.8 | 22.04.2015 | [2017/10] | WO2015US27105 | Priority number, date | US201461987728P | 02.05.2014 Original published format: US 201461987728 P | [2017/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015167899 | Date: | 05.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3137259 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.11.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B24B37/02, B24D11/00, B24B37/24, B24B37/26, B24B7/22 | [2018/01] | CPC: |
B24B7/228 (EP,KR,US);
B24B37/22 (EP,KR,US);
B24B37/245 (EP,KR,US);
B24B37/26 (EP,KR,US);
B24D11/00 (EP,US);
B24D11/02 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2017/10] | B24D11/02, B24D7/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/10] | Title | German: | UNTERBROCHEN STRUKTURIERTER SCHLEIFARTIKEL UND VERFAHREN ZUM POLIEREN EINES WERKSTÜCKES | [2017/10] | English: | INTERRUPTED STRUCTURED ABRASIVE ARTICLE AND METHODS OF POLISHING A WORKPIECE | [2017/10] | French: | ARTICLE ABRASIF STRUCTURÉ INTERROMPU ET PROCÉDÉ DE POLISSAGE D'UNE PIÈCE À TRAVAILLER | [2017/10] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2016 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/10] | 02.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.05.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US6165904 (KIM KYUNG-HYUN [KR]) [I] 10* abstract *; | [Y]US2004163946 (CHANG SHOU-SUNG [US], et al) [Y] 6,12 * abstract *; | [XYI]WO2008109211 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 5,7-9,11,13-15 * page 1, lines 7-8 * * page 5, lines 26-32 * * page 11, lines 14-31 * * figures 3, 4a, 5-7 * [Y] 6,12 [I] 4; | [Y]WO2009140622 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [Y] 1-3 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 28] , [0 35] , [0 45]; figures 1, 3 *; | [Y]US2011281510 (SWEDEK BOGUSLAW A [US], et al) [Y] 6,12 * abstract *; | [Y]US2012255635 (BANDA SUMANTH [US], et al) [Y] 1-3 * figures 3A, 3B, 4 * * paragraphs [0045] , [0 46] , [0 50] * | International search | [Y]US2006128291 (MULDOWNEY GREGORY P [US]) [Y] 1-17 * See paragraphs [0015]-[0024] and figure 1. *; | [Y]US2007243803 (OKA HITOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-17 * See paragraphs [0038]-[0060]; claim 1; and figures 1-6f. *; | [A]US2011256818 (SWEDEK BOGUSLAW A [US], et al) [A] 1-17* See paragraphs [0017]-[0040] and figure 1. *; | [A]US2012252324 (HREHA RICHARD D [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * See paragraphs [0037]-[0060] and figure 16. *; | [A]US2014102010 (ALLISON WILLIAM C [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * See paragraphs [0028]-[0054] and figures 1-4. * |