EP3136912 - THERAPEUTIC CORE BUILDING AND MASSAGE CHAIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continuum Innovation LLC 1220 Washington Street West Newton, MA 02465 / US | [2017/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROERMAN, Alex 159 Windsor Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 02 /
KRONCKE, Doug 14 Caulfield Road Wayland, MA 01778 / US | 03 /
MOISE, Kyle 134 W. Concord Street Apt. 4 Boston, MA 02117 / US | 04 /
ZACCAI, Gianfranco 2 Southfield Court Needham, MA 02492 / US | [2017/10] | Representative(s) | Fiammenghi, Alessandro PRAXI Intellectual Property S.p.A. Via Leonida Bissolati, 20 00187 Roma (RM) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2017/10] | Fiammenghi, Alessandro Fiammenghi - Fiammenghi 15, Via San Gottardo 6900 Lugano / CH | Application number, filing date | 15786801.9 | 29.04.2015 | [2017/10] | WO2015US28355 | Priority number, date | US201461986044P | 29.04.2014 Original published format: US 201461986044 P | [2017/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015168324 | Date: | 05.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3136912 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A47C7/02 | [2017/10] | CPC: |
A47C3/18 (EP,US);
A47C7/004 (EP,US);
A47C7/006 (EP,US);
A47C7/029 (EP,US);
A47C7/402 (EP,US);
A47C9/002 (EP,US);
A61H15/00 (US);
A61H23/02 (EP,US);
A61H2015/0014 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0149 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1633 (US);
A61H2201/5043 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5058 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5061 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5084 (EP,US);
A61H2205/086 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/10] | Title | German: | THERAPEUTISCHER KERNAUFBAU UND MASSAGESESSEL | [2017/10] | English: | THERAPEUTIC CORE BUILDING AND MASSAGE CHAIR | [2017/10] | French: | CHAISE THÉRAPEUTIQUE DE MASSAGE ET DE RENFORCEMENT MUSCULAIRE DU TRONC | [2017/10] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2016 | Search fee paid | 24.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/10] | 24.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/14] | 28.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US7607738 (GREGORY et al) [X] 1, 13 * entire document * [Y] 1, 13-14; | [XY]US7311681 (VACCARELLA) [X] 1, 5-7 * entire document * [Y] 8-12; | [Y]US2005242635 (CASSADY) [Y] 8 * entire document *; | [Y]US2010026142 (JONES et al) [Y] 9-11 * entire document *; | [Y]US4650247 (BERG et al) [Y] 12 * entire document *; | [Y]CN203088261U (YECHENG) [Y] 1, 13-14 * see machine translation *; | [A]DE19711924 (MAY-ROPERS) [A] 1-14 * see machine translation *; | [A]US7713220 (CHEN) [A] 1-14 * entire document *; | [A]US6053880 (SLEICHTER III) [A] 1-14 * entire document * |