EP3221536 - FLAT KEY AND CYLINDER LOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IS | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EVVA Sicherheitstechnologie GmbH Wienerbergstrasse 59-65 1120 Wien / AT | [2017/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEUMAYER, Harald Rennbahnweg 46/8/53 A-1220 Wien / AT | [2017/39] | Representative(s) | Puchberger & Partner Patentanwälte Reichsratsstraße 13 1010 Wien / AT | [2017/39] | Application number, filing date | 15787639.2 | 02.11.2015 | [2017/39] | WO2015EP75444 | Priority number, date | AT20140050837 | 18.11.2014 Original published format: AT 508372014 | [2017/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016078899 | Date: | 26.05.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3221536 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3221536 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E05B19/00, E05B27/00, E05B29/00 | [2017/39] | CPC: |
E05B19/0023 (EP,RU);
E05B29/00 (AT);
E05B19/0017 (AT);
E05B19/0064 (EP,RU);
E05B27/0042 (EP,AT,RU);
E05B29/0033 (EP,RU);
E05B47/0044 (AT)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLACHSCHLÜSSEL UND ZYLINDERSCHLOSS | [2017/39] | English: | FLAT KEY AND CYLINDER LOCK | [2017/39] | French: | CLÉ PLATE ET SERRURE À BARILLET | [2017/39] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/39] | 25.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 12.09.2018 | MK | 12.09.2018 | [2022/30] |
Former [2020/31] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
MK | 12.09.2018 | ||
IS | 24.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
IS | 24.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | IS | 24.10.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2009124571 (HUF HUELSBECK & FUERST GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-17 * page 3, line 22 - page 6, line 2 * * claim 1 * * claim 4 * * claim 18 * * figures 1-4, 6a, 6b *; | [A]WO2011063968 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-17 * page 24, line 5 - page 26, line 15 * * figures 6A-6E *; | [A]EP0814222 (EVVA WERKE [AT]) [A] 1-17 * column 1, line 42 - column 3, line 58 * * figures 1-16 * |