EP3212026 - SHOE AND/OR INSOLE SELECTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK, PT | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Superfeet Worldwide, Inc. 1820 Scout Place Ferndale, Washington 98248 / US | [2017/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOOCH, Matthew Warren 1820 Scout Place Ferndale, WA 98248 / US | 02 /
HAYES, Eric 1820 Scout Place Ferndale, WA 98248 / US | 03 /
WAKELAND, Daniel 1820 Scout Place Ferndale, WA 98248 / US | [2017/36] | Representative(s) | Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/33] | Ström & Gulliksson AB P O Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [2017/36] | Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 15787880.2 | 26.10.2015 | [2017/36] | WO2015US57408 | Priority number, date | US201414527655 | 29.10.2014 Original published format: US201414527655 | [2017/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016069491 | Date: | 06.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3212026 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3212026 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A43D1/02, A43D1/06, A43D1/08 | [2017/36] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0631 (EP,KR,US);
A43D1/025 (EP,KR,US);
A43D1/06 (EP,KR,US);
A43D1/08 (EP,KR,US);
G06Q30/0621 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0623 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHUH- UND/ODER EINLEGESOHLENAUSWAHLSYSTEM | [2017/36] | English: | SHOE AND/OR INSOLE SELECTION SYSTEM | [2017/36] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SÉLECTION DE CHAUSSURE ET/OU DE SEMELLE INTÉRIEURE | [2017/36] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.08.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/36] | 27.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.10.2015 | AL | 12.08.2020 | AT | 12.08.2020 | CY | 12.08.2020 | CZ | 12.08.2020 | DK | 12.08.2020 | EE | 12.08.2020 | ES | 12.08.2020 | FI | 12.08.2020 | HR | 12.08.2020 | IT | 12.08.2020 | LT | 12.08.2020 | LV | 12.08.2020 | MC | 12.08.2020 | MK | 12.08.2020 | MT | 12.08.2020 | PL | 12.08.2020 | PT | 12.08.2020 | RO | 12.08.2020 | RS | 12.08.2020 | SE | 12.08.2020 | SI | 12.08.2020 | SK | 12.08.2020 | SM | 12.08.2020 | TR | 12.08.2020 | IE | 26.10.2020 | LU | 26.10.2020 | CH | 31.10.2020 | LI | 31.10.2020 | BG | 12.11.2020 | NO | 12.11.2020 | GR | 13.11.2020 | IS | 12.12.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 26.10.2015 | |
AL | 12.08.2020 | ||
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CY | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
MT | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
TR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IE | 26.10.2020 | ||
LU | 26.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
IE | 26.10.2020 | ||
LU | 26.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
LU | 26.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
LU | 26.10.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
LU | 26.10.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
LU | 26.10.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 12.08.2020 | |
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | CZ | 12.08.2020 | |
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 12.08.2020 | |
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | DK | 12.08.2020 | |
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5790256 (BROWN ALGIE C [US], et al) [Y] 7,15,23,30 * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 15 * * column 4, lines 40-51; figure - *; | [Y]US6546356 (GENEST LEONARD J [US]) [Y] 8,16 * abstract * * column 4, lines 41-59 * * column 5, lines 47-55 *; | [A]US2005049816 (ODA TAKAO [JP], et al) [A] 1-30 * claim 16 * * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0172] *; | [A]US2011055053 (RUTSCHMANN DIRK [DE]) [A] 1-30 * figure -; claims 1-6 *; | [A]EP2433516 (SCHELCHEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-30 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0015] *; | [A]WO2013026798 (MAGARI S R L [IT], et al) [A] 8,16 * claim 4 *; | [XYI]US2014149072 (RUTSCHMANN DIRK [DE]) [X] 1-4,6,9-12,14,17-20,22,24-27,29 * paragraphs [0022] , [0023] , [0028] , [0054] - [0073]; figure -; claims 1, 4 * [Y] 7,8,15,16,23,30 [I] 5,13,21,28; | [A]US8751320 (KEMIST ADAM [US]) [A] 1-30 * column 5, line 50 - column 6, line 9 ** column 12, lines 22-65; figure - * |