EP3206862 - PROCESS FOR FORMING AN ARTICLE WITH A PRECISION SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Media Lario s.r.l. Località Pascolo 23842 Bosisio Parini (LC) / IT | [2017/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BANHAM, Robert David 4 Queen Elizabeth Close Leiston Suffolk / GB | 02 /
VALSECCHI, Guiseppe Via ai Campi 37 23848 Oggiono / IT | 03 /
CITTERIO, Oberto Via Madresca 40 22044 Inveriga / IT | [2023/51] |
Former [2017/34] | 01 /
BANHAM, Robert David 4 Queen Elizabeth Close Leiston Suffolk / GB | ||
02 /
VALSECCHI, Guiseppe Via ai Campi 37 I-23848 Oggiono / IT | |||
03 /
CITTERIO, Oberto Via Madresca 40 I-22044 Inveriga / IT | Representative(s) | Felber, Josef Felber & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 116 8008 Zürich / CH | [2017/34] | Application number, filing date | 15787909.9 | 12.10.2015 | [2017/34] | WO2015EP73527 | Priority number, date | US201462064043P | 15.10.2014 Original published format: US 201462064043 P | [2017/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016058975 | Date: | 21.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3206862 | Date: | 23.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3206862 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B29D11/00, B29C53/04, // B29L11/00 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
B29D11/00596 (EP,US);
C03B23/02 (CN);
C03B23/0357 (CN,US);
B29C53/04 (EP,US);
B29D11/00865 (EP,US);
C03B23/0302 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2017/34] | B29D11/00, B29C51/10, B29C51/12, B29C51/14, B29C51/36, B29C53/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR FORMUNG EINES ARTIKELS MIT EINER PRÄZISIONSOBERFLÄCHE | [2017/34] | English: | PROCESS FOR FORMING AN ARTICLE WITH A PRECISION SURFACE | [2017/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION D'UN ARTICLE PRÉSENTANT UNE SURFACE DE PRÉCISION | [2017/34] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/34] | 08.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 16.11.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 16.11.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.11.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2021 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   23.03.2022 | 31.10.2023 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   12.12.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 17.01.2024 | HR | 17.01.2024 | PL | 17.01.2024 | NO | 17.04.2024 | RS | 17.04.2024 | GR | 18.04.2024 | IS | 17.05.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | ES | 17.01.2024 | |
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | HR | 17.01.2024 | |
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | NO | 17.04.2024 | |
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 17.05.2024 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4038014 (DUSZA ROBERT J, et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,8,10 * figures 4,5,2,3 *; | [XAYI]US2011198021 (MEYER ANDREAS [DE], et al) [X] 11,12,17,18 * paragraph [0081]; figures 3,4 * [A] 19-24 [Y] 15[I] 13,14,16; | [XY]EP2463094 (ENTROTECH INC [US]) [X] 1,4,6,9 * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0088]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0093] , [ 00128] , [00131] * [Y] 15; | [A]US2014234581 (IMMERMAN JACOB [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * figure 9 * | Examination | US4035065 | US2005037224 |