EP3140217 - CARRIER FOR CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SM | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Graphic Packaging International, LLC Law department - 9th floor 1500 Riveredge Parkway, Suite 100 Atlanta, GA 30328 / US | [2018/19] |
Former [2017/11] | For all designated states Graphic Packaging International, Inc. Law Department - 9th Floor 1500 Riveredge Parkway, Suite 100 Atlanta, Georgia 30328 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLLEY, John, Murdick 950 Brentwood Avenue Lawrenceville, GA 30044 / US | [2017/11] | Representative(s) | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Wittelsbacherstrasse 2b 82319 Starnberg / DE | [2023/31] |
Former [2017/11] | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Wittelsbacherstrasse 2b 82319 Starnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 15789232.4 | 08.05.2015 | [2017/11] | WO2015US29826 | Priority number, date | US201461996512P | 09.05.2014 Original published format: US 201461996512 P | [2017/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015171982 | Date: | 12.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3140217 | Date: | 15.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3140217 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.11.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B65D71/58 | [2017/11] | CPC: |
B65D71/0022 (EP,US);
B65D71/0014 (US);
B65D2571/00141 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00308 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00388 (EP,US);
B65D2571/0045 (US);
B65D2571/00456 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00475 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00487 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRÄGER FÜR BEHÄLTER | [2017/11] | English: | CARRIER FOR CONTAINERS | [2017/11] | French: | PORTEUR POUR RÉCIPIENTS | [2017/11] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2016 | Search fee paid | 30.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/11] | 30.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 14.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 02.08.2023 | PL | 02.08.2023 | RS | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | NO | 02.11.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | [2024/20] |
Former [2024/10] | HR | 02.08.2023 | |
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 02.11.2023 | |
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 02.11.2023 | |
GR | 03.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4308950 (WOOD PRENTICE J) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]US6341689 (JONES MARTY [US]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]US6598739 (COLLURA PETER [US]) [A] 1-18* the whole document *; | [A]DE202011003191U (A & R CARTON BV [NL]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]US2012000913 (SMALLEY BRIAN [GB], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US4205748 (WILSON JERRY F [US]) [A] 1-26 * See column 2, lines 33-68 and figures 1-2. *; | [A]EP0822150 (RIVERWOOD INT CORP [US]) [A] 1-26* See column 3, lines 22-42, column 4, lines 1-10 and figure 6. *; | [A]US2006231440 (HOLLEY JR JOHN M [US]) [A] 1-26 * See paragraphs [0027]-[0032] and figures 1-2. *; | [X]US2011048975 (BRAND KIRSTEN L [US]) [X] 1-26 * See paragraphs [0020]-[0021], [0025]-[0026], [0031]-[0032], [0038], [0041], [0055] and figures 1, 8-9, 11. *; | [A]US2012000913 (SMALLEY BRIAN [GB], et al) [A] 1-26 * See paragraphs [0033]-[0036] and figures 1, 7. * |