EP3142168 - POWER STORAGE MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AutoNetworks Technologies, Ltd. 1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-8503 / JP | For all designated states Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-8503 / JP | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [2020/25] |
Former [2017/11] | For all designated states AutoNetworks Technologies, Ltd. 1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-8503 / JP | ||
For all designated states Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-8503 / JP | |||
For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUBOKI Hideyuki c/o AUTONETWORKS TECHNOLOGIES LTD. 1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi Mie 510-8503 / JP | 02 /
HIRAI Hiroki c/o AUTONETWORKS TECHNOLOGIES LTD. 1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi Mie 510-8503 / JP | 03 /
SAKATA Tomoyuki c/o AUTONETWORKS TECHNOLOGIES LTD. 1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi Mie 510-8503 / JP | 04 /
HIGASHIKOZONO Makoto c/o AUTONETWORKS TECHNOLOGIES LTD. 1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi Mie 510-8503 / JP | 05 /
ICHIO Toshifumi c/o AUTONETWORKS TECHNOLOGIES LTD. 1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi Mie 510-8503 / JP | 06 /
NAKAGAWA Kenji c/o AUTONETWORKS TECHNOLOGIES LTD. 1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi Mie 510-8503 / JP | [2017/11] | Representative(s) | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Schmid-Dreyer Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theresienhöhe 12 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/11] | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Patentanwälte PartG mbB Ganghoferstrasse 29a 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15789377.7 | 28.04.2015 | [2017/11] | WO2015JP62786 | Priority number, date | JP20140095693 | 07.05.2014 Original published format: JP 2014095693 | [2017/11] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015170642 | Date: | 12.11.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3142168 | Date: | 15.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3142168 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.11.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/10, H01G2/04, H01G11/12, H01G11/16, H01G11/76, H01M2/20, H01M2/34, H01M10/48, H01M10/613, H01M10/625, H01M10/647, H01M10/6555 | [2017/11] | CPC: |
H01G2/04 (EP,US);
H01G11/12 (EP,US);
H01G11/16 (EP,US);
H01G11/76 (EP,US);
H01G9/0003 (US);
H01G9/008 (US);
H01G9/08 (US);
H01M10/482 (EP,US);
H01M50/209 (EP,US);
H01M50/296 (EP,US);
H01M50/507 (EP,US);
H01M50/548 (EP,US);
H01M50/581 (US);
H01M50/583 (EP,US);
H01M10/48 (EP,US);
H01M10/613 (EP,US);
H01M10/625 (EP,US);
H01M10/647 (EP,US);
H01M10/6555 (EP,US);
H01M2200/103 (US);
H01M50/262 (EP,US);
H01M50/516 (EP,US);
H01M50/522 (EP,US);
H01M50/569 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSSPEICHERMODUL | [2017/11] | English: | POWER STORAGE MODULE | [2017/11] | French: | MODULE DE STOCKAGE D'ÉNERGIE | [2017/11] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2016 | Translation filed | 19.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2016 | Search fee paid | 19.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/11] | 19.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.04.2015 | AL | 17.06.2020 | AT | 17.06.2020 | CY | 17.06.2020 | CZ | 17.06.2020 | DK | 17.06.2020 | EE | 17.06.2020 | ES | 17.06.2020 | FI | 17.06.2020 | HR | 17.06.2020 | IT | 17.06.2020 | LT | 17.06.2020 | LV | 17.06.2020 | MC | 17.06.2020 | NL | 17.06.2020 | PL | 17.06.2020 | RO | 17.06.2020 | RS | 17.06.2020 | SE | 17.06.2020 | SI | 17.06.2020 | SK | 17.06.2020 | SM | 17.06.2020 | BG | 17.09.2020 | NO | 17.09.2020 | GR | 18.09.2020 | IS | 17.10.2020 | PT | 19.10.2020 | [2023/30] |
Former [2023/27] | HU | 28.04.2015 | |
AL | 17.06.2020 | ||
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 17.06.2020 | |
NO | 17.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005060025 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [X] 1-3 * page 3, line 24 - page 13, line 28; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2007207377 (HAN JI H [KR], et al) [A] 1-3* paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0067]; figures 7-9 *; | [A]WO2011040297 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]US2013236805 (FURUYA SUMIYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0048]; figures 4,5A&B *; | [E]EP3104467 (AUTONETWORKS TECHNOLOGIES LTD [JP], et al) [E] 1-3 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0054]; figures 1,2,3,4,5,6 * | International search | [A]JP2010055885 (YAZAKI CORP) [A] 1-3 * , paragraphs [0021] to [0036]; fig. 1 to 6 & US 2010/0055993 A1 & CN 101662035 A *; | [A]JP2011040335 (YAZAKI CORP) [A] 1-3 * , paragraphs [0022] to [0048]; fig. 1 to 6 & US 2011/0045329 A1 & CN 101997106 A *; | [A]JP2013114956 (AUTO NETWORK GIJUTSU KENKYUSHO, et al) [A] 1-3 * , paragraphs [0019] to [0039]; fig. 1 to 10 & US 2014/0322978 A1 & WO 2013/080780 A1 & EP 2787580 A1 & CN 103959575 A & KR 10-2014-0088584 A *; | [A]US2013288530 (ZHAO WEIPING [US]) [A] 1-3* , paragraphs [0040] to [0080]; fig. 1 to 12 & JP 2015-507819 A & WO 2013/090649 A1 & CN 104081559 A & KR 10-2014-0093997 A * |