EP3215560 - COMPOSITION FOR POLYMERIC CHAIN EXTENSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant Plastics & Coatings Ltd Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz / CH | [2017/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOLF, Jürgen Auestieg 25 22926 Ahrensburg / DE | 02 /
WARTIG, Karen-Alessa Rückertstrasse 3 22089 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
VAN DEN ABBEELE, Tim Woldenhorn 16 22926 Ahrensburg / DE | 04 /
LÜNSTÄDEN, Tim Poppenbüttlerstrasse 141A 22851 Norderstedt / DE | [2017/46] |
Former [2017/37] | 01 /
WOLF, Jürgen An der Schlossgärtnerei 28 22926 Ahrensburg / DE | ||
02 /
WARTIG, Karen-Alessa Rückertstrasse 3 22089 Hamburg / DE | |||
03 /
VAN DEN ABBEELE, Tim Woldenhorn 16 22926 Ahrensburg / DE | |||
04 /
LÜNSTÄDEN, Tim Poppenbüttlerstrasse 141A 22851 Norderstedt / DE | Representative(s) | Jacobi, Carola Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Patent & License Management Chemicals Industriepark Höchst, G 860 65926 Frankfurt / DE | [2017/37] | Application number, filing date | 15790056.4 | 23.10.2015 | [2017/37] | WO2015EP74630 | Priority number, date | EP20140003779 | 05.11.2014 Original published format: EP 14003779 | [2017/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016071126 | Date: | 12.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3215560 | Date: | 13.09.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3215560 | Date: | 24.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C08J11/26, C08K5/12, C08J3/22, C08L67/02, C08L69/00 | [2017/37] | CPC: |
C08G63/916 (EP,CN,US);
C08J3/226 (KR);
C08G63/16 (US);
C08G64/42 (EP,CN,US);
C08K5/12 (CN,KR);
C08K9/12 (KR);
C08L25/06 (KR);
C08L55/02 (KR);
C08L67/02 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C08K5/12, C08L67/02 (CN);
C08K5/12, C08L69/00 (CN);
C08L67/02, C08K5/12 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PL, SE, TR [2019/30] |
Former [2017/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR POLYMERKETTENVERLÄNGERUNG | [2019/09] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR POLYMERIC CHAIN EXTENSION | [2017/37] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR L'EXTENSION D'UNE CHAÎNE POLYMÈRE | [2019/09] |
Former [2017/37] | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR POLYMERKETTENVERLÄNGERUNG | ||
Former [2017/37] | COMPOSITION POUR ALLONGEMENT DE CHAÎNE POLYMÈRE | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/37] | 18.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4698382 (MCCLURE GEORGE R [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7 * claim 1 *; | [XI]US6180251 (KANAI HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,6-9 * claim 1 * * column 8, line 65 - column 9, line 37 * * column 10, line 50 - column 11, line 35 * * table 1 * [I] 2,4,5; | [X]WO2012151101 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-9 * claims 1,3 * * page 5, line 30 - page 6, line 24 *; | [A] - SCHEIRS J ET AL, Modern Polyesters: Chemistry and Technology of Polyesters and Copolyesters, Additives for the Modification of Poly(Ethylene Terephthalate) to Produce Engineering-Grade Polymers, MODERN POLYESTERS: CHEMISTRY AND TECHNOLOGY OF POLYESTERS AND COPOLYESTERS; [WILEY SERIES IN POLYMER SCIENCE], JOHN WILEY & SONS, US, PAGE(S) 495 - 540, (20030101), XP002522241 [A] 10-14 * page 499, paragraph last paragraph - page 500, paragraph 2 * | [A] - LINDA GOUISSEM ET AL, "The evolution of properties of recycled poly(ethylene terephthalate) as function of chain extenders, the extrusion cycle and heat treatment", POLYMER SCIENCE SERIES A, (20141101), vol. 56, no. 6, doi:10.1134/S0965545X14060157, ISSN 0965-545X, pages 844 - 855, XP055160185 [A] 10-14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1134/S0965545X14060157 | Examination | US3186961 | US5654347 | EP0801108 | US5830982 | US2002077399 | WO2005123820 | WO2012075164 | WO2014157602 | EP2980148 |