EP3274524 - CLEAN GAS CABIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M. Braun Inertgas-Systeme GmbH Dieselstraße 31 85748 Garching / DE | [2018/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPREITZER, Gerhard Zugspitzstrasse 6 85659 Forstern / DE | 02 /
KOEPKE, Martin Franz-Gruber-Str. 17 5020 Salzburg / AT | 03 /
BULTMANN, Thomas Wasserturmstrasse 10 85748 Garching / DE | [2018/12] |
Former [2018/05] | 01 /
SPREITZER, Gerhard Zugspitzstrasse 6 85659 Forstern / DE | ||
02 /
KOEPKE, Martin Am Stutenanger 10 85764 Oberschleissheim / DE | |||
03 /
BULTMANN, Thomas Wasserturmstrasse 10 85748 Garching / DE | Representative(s) | Herrmann, Jochen Patentanwalt European Patent Attorney Königstrasse 30 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [2018/05] | Application number, filing date | 15790863.3 | 26.10.2015 | [2018/05] | WO2015EP74763 | Priority number, date | DE201510104376 | 24.03.2015 Original published format: DE102015104376 | [2018/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016150526 | Date: | 29.09.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3274524 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E04H5/02, B01L1/04, F24F3/16 | [2018/05] | CPC: |
E04H5/02 (EP,CN,KR);
E04B1/12 (EP,CN);
B01L1/04 (EP,CN,KR);
E04B1/34321 (EP,CN,KR);
E04B1/3483 (EP);
E04H15/62 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/05] | Title | German: | REINGASKABINE | [2018/05] | English: | CLEAN GAS CABIN | [2018/05] | French: | CABINE À ATMOSPHÈRE PROPRE | [2018/05] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/05] | 06.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/09] | 12.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the invitation to file a copy of earlier search results or a statement of non-availability not received in time [2019/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0218210 (DAW INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4,15 * figures 1, 4, 5 * [A] 3,5-14,16; | [XA]US3946528 (JACOBSON ISADORE A, et al) [X] 1,4-6,12 * column 1, lines 9-12; figures 1,2,5, 6,7,9,10, 11,13,15, 26 * [A] 2,3,7-11,13-16; | [XAI]DE202006003776U (NAGARAJ N C PARTHASARATHY [DE]) [X] 1,4,9 * paragraphs [0001] , [0022] , [0024] , [0025] - [0027] - [ 0033]; figures 1-3 * [A] 2,3,6-8,10-16 [I] 5; | [XI]US2013206058 (MAUCK JUSTIN [US], et al) [X] 1,4 * paragraphs [0002] , [0091]; figures 2-5 * [I] 5 |