EP3238404 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SENDING AND VERIFYING A SIGNATURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WENG, Wenrong Emmastr. 8 81825 München / DE | [2017/44] | Application number, filing date | 15790865.8 | 27.10.2015 | [2017/44] | WO2015EP74781 | Priority number, date | DE201410226772 | 22.12.2014 Original published format: DE102014226772 | [2017/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016102105 | Date: | 30.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3238404 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2017/44] | CPC: |
H04L63/123 (EP,CN,US);
H04L9/3247 (US);
H04L63/0823 (US);
H04L9/3268 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/44] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM SENDEN UND VERIFIZIEREN EINER SIGNATUR | [2017/44] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SENDING AND VERIFYING A SIGNATURE | [2017/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ D'ENVOI ET DE VÉRIFICATION D'UNE SIGNATURE | [2017/44] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/44] | 02.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/52] | 07.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2012096564 (LI JI [CN]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0036]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0096] *; | [I]US2013291082 (GILADI ALEXANDER [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0078] * * paragraph [0105] - paragraph [0110] * * figures 1,2,13 *; | [A] - ADRIAN PERRIG ET AL, "The TESLA Broadcast Authentication Protocol", RSA LABORATORIES CRYPTOBYTES,, (20060630), vol. 5, pages 2 - 13, XP007906849 [A] 1-15 * Abstract, Section 1 and Section 3.1 * |