EP3209328 - INHIBITORS OF LACTATE TRANSPORTERS FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATORY DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University Of Birmingham Edgbaston Birmingham B15 2TT / GB | [2022/11] |
Former [2017/35] | For all designated states Queen Mary University of London Mile End Road London E1 4NS / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAURO, Claudio Centre for Biochemical Pharmacology William Harvey Research Institute Heart Centre Charterhouse Square London EC1M 6BQ / GB | 02 /
HAAS, Robert Centre for Biochemical Pharmacology William Harvey Research Institute Heart Centre Charterhouse Square London EC1M 6BQ / GB | 03 /
MARELLI-BERG, Federica Centre for Biochemical Pharmacology William Harvey Research Institute Heart Centre Charterhouse Square London EC1M 6BQ / GB | [2017/35] | Representative(s) | Bassil, Nicholas Charles, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2021/35] |
Former [2017/35] | Bassil, Nicholas Charles, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15791340.1 | 20.10.2015 | [2017/35] | WO2015GB53125 | Priority number, date | GB20140018626 | 20.10.2014 Original published format: GB 201418626 | [2017/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016063037 | Date: | 28.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3209328 | Date: | 30.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3209328 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, C07K16/18, C07K16/28 | [2017/35] | CPC: |
C12N15/113 (EP,US);
A61K39/395 (US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07K16/18 (EP,US);
C07K16/28 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,US);
C12N2310/14 (EP,US);
C12N2310/531 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HEMMER VON LACTATTRANSPORTERN ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER BEHANDLUNG VON ENTZÜNDLICHEN ERKRANKUNGEN | [2017/35] | English: | INHIBITORS OF LACTATE TRANSPORTERS FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATORY DISEASES | [2017/35] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE TRANSPORTEURS DE LACTATE DESTINÉS À ÊTRE UTILISÉS DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES INFLAMMATOIRES | [2017/35] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/35] | 27.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.10.2015 | AL | 01.09.2021 | AT | 01.09.2021 | CY | 01.09.2021 | CZ | 01.09.2021 | DK | 01.09.2021 | EE | 01.09.2021 | ES | 01.09.2021 | FI | 01.09.2021 | HR | 01.09.2021 | IT | 01.09.2021 | LT | 01.09.2021 | LV | 01.09.2021 | MC | 01.09.2021 | MK | 01.09.2021 | NL | 01.09.2021 | PL | 01.09.2021 | RO | 01.09.2021 | RS | 01.09.2021 | SE | 01.09.2021 | SI | 01.09.2021 | SK | 01.09.2021 | SM | 01.09.2021 | TR | 01.09.2021 | IE | 20.10.2021 | LU | 20.10.2021 | BE | 31.10.2021 | CH | 31.10.2021 | LI | 31.10.2021 | BG | 01.12.2021 | NO | 01.12.2021 | GR | 02.12.2021 | IS | 01.01.2022 | PT | 03.01.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 20.10.2015 | |
AL | 01.09.2021 | ||
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CY | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
MK | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
IE | 20.10.2021 | ||
LU | 20.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 20.10.2015 | |
AL | 01.09.2021 | ||
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CY | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
IE | 20.10.2021 | ||
LU | 20.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 20.10.2015 | |
AL | 01.09.2021 | ||
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
IE | 20.10.2021 | ||
LU | 20.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
IE | 20.10.2021 | ||
LU | 20.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
LU | 20.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
LU | 20.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
LU | 20.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 01.09.2021 | |
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 01.09.2021 | |
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 01.09.2021 | |
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | ES | 01.09.2021 | |
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | ES | 01.09.2021 | |
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | ES | 01.09.2021 | |
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 01.09.2021 | |
NO | 01.12.2021 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2004072746 (SULLIVAN MICHAEL [GB], et al) [Y] 5,6,8 * the whole document * * in particular, paragraphs 76, 115 and 242 *; | [XY]WO2010089580 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [X] 2,4,7,9,11-13,15,17-20 * page 8 * [Y] 5,6,8; | [X]KR20120123748 (WONKWANG UNIVERSITY CENTER FOR INDUSTRY-ACADEMY COOPERATION [KR]) [X] 2,4,9,11-13,15,17 * abstract *; | [X] - Anonymous, "NCT01791595 on 2013_10_07: ClinicalTrials.gov Archive", (20131007), URL: https://clinicaltrials.gov/archive/NCT01791595/2013_10_07, (20160115), XP055241680 [X] 2,4,7,9,11-13,15,17-20 * the whole document * * in particular, summary * | [X] - RENAUD LE FLOCH ET AL, "CD147 subunit of lactate/H+ symporters MCT1 and hypoxia-inducible MCT4 is critical for energetics and growth of glycolytic tumors", PROC NATL ACAD SCI, (20111004), vol. 108, no. 40, pages 16663 - 16668, XP055241679 [X] 2,4,7,15,17-20 * the whole document * * in particular, page 16664 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1106123108 | [X] - JOANNE R. DOHERTY ET AL, "Targeting lactate metabolism for cancer therapeutics", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, US, (20130903), vol. 123, no. 9, doi:10.1172/JCI69741, ISSN 0021-9738, pages 3685 - 3692, XP055239122 [X] 2,4,7,15,17-20 * the whole document * * in particular, page 3688 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI69741 | [X] - CHICHE J ET AL, "The monocarboxylate transporter 1 (MCT1) and Hypoxia-induced MCT4 are key targets promoting tumor cell survival", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CANCER. SUPPLEMENT, PERGAMON, OXFORD, GB, vol. 6, no. 9, doi:10.1016/S1359-6349(08)71267-9, ISSN 1359-6349, (20080701), page 24, (20080701), XP022833613 [X] 2,4,7,15,17 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1359-6349(08)71267-9 | [X] - PIERRE SONVEAUX ET AL, "Targeting lactate-fueled respiration selectively kills hypoxic tumor cells in mice", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, US, (20081120), doi:10.1172/JCI36843, ISSN 0021-9738, XP055242099 [X] 2,4,7,15,17 * the whole document * * for instance, the abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI36843 | [A] - Robert Haas ET AL, "In the eye of the storm: T cell behavior in the inflammatory microenvironment", Am J Clin Exp Immunol, (20130615), pages 146 - 155, URL: http://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC3714175/pdf/ajcei0002-0146.pdf, (20160112), XP055240437 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * * in particular, pages 150-151 * | [A] - CLARE M MURRAY ET AL, "Monocarboxylate transporter MCT1 is a target for immunosuppression", NATURE CHEMICAL BIOLOGY, GB, (20051201), vol. 1, no. 7, doi:10.1038/nchembio744, ISSN 1552-4450, pages 371 - 376, XP055241382 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * * in particular, pages 372-373 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nchembio744 | [XP] - ROBERT HAAS ET AL, "Lactate Regulates Metabolic and Pro-inflammatory Circuits in Control of T Cell Migration and Effector Functions", PLOS BIOLOGY, (20150716), vol. 13, no. 7, doi:10.1371/journal.pbio.1002202, page e1002202, XP055240411 [XP] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pbio.1002202 | Examination | - GOPAL ET AL, "Cloning and functional characterization of human SMCT2 (SLC5A12) and expression pattern of the transporter in kidney", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA (BBA) - BIOMEMBRANES, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20071101), vol. 1768, no. 11, doi:10.1016/J.BBAMEM.2007.06.031, ISSN 0005-2736, pages 2690 - 2697, XP022338988 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbamem.2007.06.031 | - I Tamai ET AL, "Participation of a proton-cotransporter, MCT1, in the intestinal transpor of monocarboxylic acids", Biochemical and Biophysical Research Communications, (19950914), vol. 214, no. 2, pages 482 - 489, XP055484919 | - K. D. Rainsford, "Ibuprofen: pharmacology, efficacy and safety", INFLAMMOPHARMACOLOGY., NL, (20091121), vol. 17, no. 6, doi:10.1007/s10787-009-0016-x, ISSN 0925-4692, pages 275 - 342, XP055484915 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10787-009-0016-x | - Seema Rao ET AL, "Targeted Delivery of Anti-CTLA-4 Antibody Downregulates T Cell Function in Vitro and in Vivo", CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, US, (20011101), vol. 101, no. 2, doi:10.1006/clim.2001.5119, ISSN 1521-6616, pages 136 - 145, XP055553868 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/clim.2001.5119 | - STANIMIROVIC DANICA ET AL, "Engineering and pharmacology of blood-brain barrier-permeable bispecific antibodies", ADVANCES IN PHARMACO, ELSEVIER, USA, (20140101), vol. 71, doi:10.1016/BS.APHA.2014.06.005, ISSN 1557-8925, pages 301 - 335, XP009188677 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/bs.apha.2014.06.005 | - C S D Roxburgh ET AL, "Cancer and systemic inflammation: treat the tumour and treat the host", British Journal of Cancer, GB, (20140218), vol. 110, no. 6, doi:10.1038/bjc.2014.90, ISSN 0007-0920, pages 1409 - 1412, XP055585294 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/bjc.2014.90 | by applicant | WO2012042270 | - JARMIN ET AL., J CLIN INVEST, (2008), vol. 118, pages 1154 - 1164 | - CROIA ET AL., ANN RHEUM DIS, (2013), vol. 72, pages 1559 - 1568 | - MONTERO-MELENDEZ ET AL., AM J PATHOL, (2011), vol. 179, pages 259 - 269 | - SCHUBERT ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (2004), vol. 172, pages 4503 - 4509 |