EP3209504 - IMPROVEMENTS IN SECURITY PAPERS AND DOCUMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Portals De La Rue Limited Overton Mill Station Road Overton Hampshire RG25 3JG / GB | [2019/08] |
Former [2018/38] | For all designated states Portals De La Rue Limited Overton Mill Station Road Overton Hampshire RG25 3ST / GB | ||
Former [2018/24] | For all designated states Portals De La Rue Limited Overton Mill Sation Road Overton Hampshire RG25 3ST / GB | ||
Former [2017/35] | For all designated states De La Rue International Limited De La Rue House Jays Close Basingstoke, Hampshire RG22 4BS / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENDERSON, Peter McLean 31 Wellow Drive Frome Somerset BA11 2DU / GB | 02 /
SUGDON, Matthew Charles 38 Ilsley Road Basingstoke Hampshire RG24 9RU / GB | 03 /
STEWART, Georgina c/o De La Rue International Limited De La Rue House Jays Close Basingstoke Hampshire RG22 4BS / GB | [2017/43] |
Former [2017/35] | 01 /
HENDERSON, Peter McLean 31 Wellow Drive Frome Somerset BA11 2DU / GB | ||
02 /
SUGDON, Matthew Charles 38 Ilsley Road Basingstoke Hampshire RG24 9RU / GB | |||
03 /
STEWART, Georgina Jasmine Cottage 42 London Street Whitchurch Hampshire RG28 7LN / GB | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/01] | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2017/35] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 15791341.9 | 21.10.2015 | [2017/35] | WO2015GB53140 | Priority number, date | GB20140018854 | 23.10.2014 Original published format: GB 201418854 | [2017/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016063050 | Date: | 28.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3209504 | Date: | 30.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3209504 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3209504 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | [2019/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B42D25/45, D21H21/40, B42D25/346, B42D25/24, D21H27/30, D21H21/42, D21H21/48 | [2018/27] | CPC: |
B42D25/24 (EP);
D21H21/40 (EP,GB);
B42D25/30 (GB);
B42D25/333 (EP);
B42D25/346 (EP,GB);
B42D25/351 (EP);
B42D25/36 (GB);
B42D25/382 (EP);
B42D25/387 (EP);
B42D25/45 (EP);
D21H21/42 (EP,GB);
D21H21/44 (GB);
|
Former IPC [2017/35] | B42D25/45, D21H21/40, B42D25/346, B42D25/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNGEN AN SICHERHEITSPAPIEREN UND -DOKUMENTEN | [2017/35] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS IN SECURITY PAPERS AND DOCUMENTS | [2017/35] | French: | AMÉLIORATIONS DE PAPIERS ET DOCUMENTS DE SÉCURITÉ | [2017/35] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/35] | 11.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 02.01.2019 | AT | 02.01.2019 | CY | 02.01.2019 | CZ | 02.01.2019 | DK | 02.01.2019 | EE | 02.01.2019 | FI | 02.01.2019 | HR | 02.01.2019 | LT | 02.01.2019 | LV | 02.01.2019 | MC | 02.01.2019 | MK | 02.01.2019 | MT | 02.01.2019 | RO | 02.01.2019 | RS | 02.01.2019 | SK | 02.01.2019 | SM | 02.01.2019 | TR | 02.01.2019 | BG | 02.04.2019 | NO | 02.04.2019 | GR | 03.04.2019 | IS | 02.05.2019 | PT | 02.05.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CY | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
MT | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CY | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO0039391 (RUE DE INT LTD [GB], et al) [X] 47-49 * Abstract; pages 9,10; figures 1-11 *[A] 1-46; | [XI]GB2433470 (RUE DE INT LTD [GB]) [X] 1,36,47-49 * page 23, lines 8-23; figures 8,17,19,22,24 * [I] 2-35,37-46; | [XA]WO2012153116 (DW SPINKS EMBOSSING LTD [GB], et al) [X] 47-49 * Abstract; pages 4,10-13; figures 1a,1b * [A] 1-46 |