EP3215991 - SIMPLIFIED TRANSACTION USING A PAYMENT DEVICE AND A COMMUNICATION TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 04.05.2022 [2022/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WORLDLINE 80 Quai Voltaire Immeuble River Ouest 95870 Bezons / FR | [2017/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAMS, Hugues Avenue des Bouvreuils 6 B-1340 Ottignies / BE | 02 /
LEFEBVRE, Guillaume 4 Allée du Boisseau F-62410 Meurchin / FR | [2017/37] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [2017/37] | Application number, filing date | 15791708.9 | 22.10.2015 | [2017/37] | WO2015FR52838 | Priority number, date | FR20140060615 | 04.11.2014 Original published format: FR 1460615 | [2017/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016071602 | Date: | 12.05.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3215991 | Date: | 13.09.2017 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/02, G06Q20/20, G06Q20/32, G06Q20/40 | [2017/37] | CPC: |
G06Q20/02 (EP,CN);
G06Q20/20 (EP,CN);
G06Q20/202 (EP,CN);
G06Q20/325 (EP,CN);
G06Q20/327 (EP,CN);
G06Q20/40145 (EP,CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/37] | Title | German: | VEREINFACHTE TRANSAKTION ANHAND EINER ZAHLUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSENDGERÄT | [2017/37] | English: | SIMPLIFIED TRANSACTION USING A PAYMENT DEVICE AND A COMMUNICATION TERMINAL | [2017/37] | French: | TRANSACTION SIMPLIFIEE A L'AIDE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE PAIEMENT ET D'UN TERMINAL DE COMMUNICATION | [2017/37] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/37] | 04.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.10.2021 | 12.10.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 20.12.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/18] | 30.12.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2017 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.12.2017 | 31.10.2019 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   29.11.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US7207480 (GEDDES MARTIN [US]) [X] 1,7,11 * abstract * * column 1, lines 6-36 * * column 2, line 9 - column 6, line 39 * [I] 1-12; | [A]US2008313082 (VAN BOSCH JAMES A [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract ** paragraphs [0020] - [0033] *; | [A]US2011119141 (HOYOS HECTOR T [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] - [0013] *; | [A]GB2501318 (POWA TECHNOLOGIES LTD [GB]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 6, paragraph L - page 7, paragraph 2 * * page 10, paragraph 3 - page 13, paragraph 3 *; | [A]US2014025576 (ESCH DARRELL [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0029] - [0042] - [0051] - [0065] *; | [I]WO2014111760 (KANHATECH SOLUTIONS LTD [IN]) [I] 1-12 * abstract * * page 6, line 14 - page 12, line 20 * |