EP3143675 - BATTERY CHARGER FOR DIFFERENT POWER SOURCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.02.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tahoe Research, Ltd. Plaza 255, Suite 2A Blanchardstown Corporate Park 2 Dublin 15, D15 YH6H / IE | [2022/47] |
Former [2017/12] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Lilly 2071 NW 129th Place Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Yang-Lin Room 254 EE2 Building No. 1 Sec. 4, Roosevelt Rd. Dean Dist. Taipei City 106 / TW | 03 /
VAIDYA, Vaibhav 735 SW Saint Clair Avenue Apt. 1608 Portland, Oregon 97205 / US | [2017/12] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/12] | Somerville, Andrew Edward HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 15792207.1 | 09.04.2015 | [2017/12] | WO2015US25156 | Priority number, date | US201414278813 | 15.05.2014 Original published format: US201414278813 | [2017/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015175120 | Date: | 19.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3143675 | Date: | 22.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.11.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00, H02J7/02 | [2017/12] | CPC: |
H02J7/0068 (EP,US);
H02J7/02 (US);
H02J7/34 (RU);
H02J9/04 (RU);
H02J2207/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/12] | Title | German: | BATTERIELADEVORRICHTUNG FÜR UNTERSCHIEDLICHE STROMQUELLEN | [2017/12] | English: | BATTERY CHARGER FOR DIFFERENT POWER SOURCES | [2017/12] | French: | CHARGEUR DE BATTERIE POUR DIFFÉRENTES SOURCES D'ALIMENTATION | [2017/12] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2016 | Search fee paid | 07.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/12] | 07.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 14.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008180874 (GAUGER DANIEL M [US], et al) [X] 1,3-6,8,9,11,12,14,15 * paragraphs [0027]-[0030];; figure 3 *; | [X]US2009184687 (SCHROEDER WARREN RICHARD [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7,9,10,12,13,15* paragraphs [0018], [0019], [0071];; figure 2 * | International search | [A]US2004164704 (YANG TAI-HER [TW]) [A] 1-25 * See paragraphs 15-21, claims 1-2, and figure 1. *; | [A]US2005040785 (BARNES JUDITH A [US], et al) [A] 1-25* See paragraphs 22-27, claim 1, and figure 1. *; | [XY]JP3148817U (MING-XIANG YE) [X] 1, 3, 8-9, 11, 13, 15 , 17, 19-20, 22-23, 25 * See paragraphs 12-14, claims 1, 10, and figure 2. * [Y] 2, 4-7, 10, 12, 14, 16, 18, 21, 24; | [A]EP2437374 (BIRCHCROFT PLC [GB]) [A] 1-25 * See paragraphs 12-24, claim 1, and figure 1. *; | [Y]US2014001849 (HUANG LILLY [US], et al) [Y] 2, 4-7, 10, 12, 14, 16, 18, 21, 24 * See paragraph 46, claim 7, and figure 2. * |