EP3142674 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATMENT OF MACROPHAGE-RELATED DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.01.2019 [2019/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neuraltus Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 1001 Bayhill Drive Suite 300 San Bruno, California 94066 / US | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [2017/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCGRATH, Michael S. 1452 Benito Avenue Burlingame, California 94010 / US | 02 /
BLOCK, Gilbert 2479 E. Bayshore Road Suite 220 Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | [2017/12] | Representative(s) | Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 JJ Thomson Avenue Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/12] | Cummings, Ross Martin, et al Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 J.J. Thomson Avenue Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | Application number, filing date | 15792274.1 | 15.05.2015 | [2017/12] | WO2015US31145 | Priority number, date | US201461994736P | 16.05.2014 Original published format: US 201461994736 P | US201462051849P | 17.09.2014 Original published format: US 201462051849 P | [2017/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015175974 | Date: | 19.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3142674 | Date: | 22.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.11.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K33/20, C01B11/10, A61P25/28, A61K33/00, G01N33/68 | [2018/03] | CPC: |
A61K33/20 (EP,US);
A61K33/00 (EP,US);
A61P21/02 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
C01B11/10 (EP,US);
G01N33/6896 (EP,US);
G01N2333/70535 (EP,US);
G01N2333/70539 (EP,US);
G01N2800/2821 (EP,US);
G01N2800/2835 (EP,US);
G01N2800/52 (US);
G01N2800/7095 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/12] | A61K33/20, C01B11/10, A61P25/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/12] | Extension states | BA | 30.11.2016 | ME | 30.11.2016 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ERKRANKUNGEN IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT MAKROPHAGEN | [2017/12] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATMENT OF MACROPHAGE-RELATED DISORDERS | [2017/12] | French: | METHODES ET COMPOSITIONS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES LIÉS AUX MACROPHAGES | [2017/12] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2016 | Search fee paid | 30.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/12] | 30.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/02] | 24.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2005076819 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [X] 1,7,8,15 * claims 1,6-10,16-20 * * abstract * * the whole document * * example 3 * * examples 7,8 * [I] 2-6,9-14; | [X] - HARALD SCHEMPP ET AL, "Chlorite-Hemoprotein Interaction as Key Role for the Pharmacological Activity of the Chlorite-based Drug WF10", ARZNEIMITTEL FORSCHUNG. DRUG RESEARCH., DE, (20010101), vol. 51, no. 07, doi:10.1055/s-0031-1300079, ISSN 0004-4172, pages 554 - 562, XP055433840 [X] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-0031-1300079 | International search | [XY]WO2005076819 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [X] 1, 5/1, 7/1, 20-21, 33-34, 37/34, 43-44, 47 * ; paragraphs [0021], [0034]-[0035], [0051]-[0052], [0070], [0081]-[0082], [0092]-[0093], [0095], [0097]-[0098], [00124], [00131], [00133]-[00134]; claim 1 8 1 1 * [Y] 2, 3/1-2, 4/1-2, 5/2, 6, 7/6, 8/1, 8/6, 10/1, 10/6, 11/1, 11/6, 12/1, 12/6, 13, 14/1, 14/13, 15/1, 15/13, 16, 17/1, 17/16, 35-36, , 37/35-36; | [Y]WO2011017030 (NEURALTUS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [Y] 11/1, 12/1, 11/6, 12/6 * ; paragraphs [0020], [00213], [00234] *; | [Y]WO9853837 (SOUTHERN BIOSYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 35-35, 37/35-36 * ; page 12, lines 3 21-23 *; | [Y] - REALE, M. et al., "Relationship between inflammatory mediators, Abeta levels and ApoE genotype 2 in Alzheimer disease.", Current Alzheimer Research., (20120000), vol. 9, pages 447 - 457, XP 055237733 [Y] 2, 3/1-2, 4/1-2, 5/2 * ; page 450, right column, 'Plasma concentration of the inflammatory molecules ; table 2 * | [Y] - FORSYTH, CB et al., "Increased intestinal permeability correlates with sigmoid mucosa alpha- synuclein staining and endotoxin exposure markers in early Parkinson's disease.", PLoS ONE., (20111201), vol. 6, page e28032, XP 002677720 [Y] 6, 7/6, 8/1, 8/6, 10/1, 10/6, 11/6, 12/6 * ; table 4 * | [Y] - O'BRYANT, SE et al., "Decreased c-reactive protein levels in Alzheimer disease.", J Geriatr Psychiatry Neurol., (20100300), vol. 23, pages 49 - 53, XP055360633 [Y] 16, 17/16 * ; page 2, 2nd paragraph; table 1; abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/0891988709351832 | [Y] - GOYAL, MK et al., "Do cytokines have any role in Wilson's disease? 2008.", Clinical & Experimental Immunology., (20080000), vol. 154, pages 74 - 79, XP055360634 [Y] 13, 14/1, 14/13, 15/1, 15/13, 17/1, 17/16 * ; page 75, right column 'The WD and 1 cytokines'; page 76, right column, 'Quantitative analysis of cytokines versus clinical and laboratory parameters' * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2249.2008.03755.x |