EP3143077 - ELECTRICALLY DISSIPATIVE FOAMABLE COMPOSITION COMPRISING CONDUCTIVE CARBON POWDER EMANATING FROM LIGNIN, A METHOD FOR THE MANUFACTURING THEREOF AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stora Enso Oyj P.O. Box 309 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2017/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAROFF, Niklas Personnevägen 41 S-129 35 Hägersten / SE | 02 /
WALTER, Stephan Tallkrogsvägen 16 12263 Enskede / SE | [2017/18] |
Former [2017/12] | 01 /
GAROFF, Niklas Personnevägen 41 S-129 35 Hägersten / SE | ||
02 /
WALTER, Stephan Rolandstrasse 56 52070 Aachen / DE | Representative(s) | Steinrud, Henrik, et al Stora Enso AB Group Intellectual Property Box 9090 65009 Karlstad / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/12] | Lindberg, Berndt Åke Stora Enso AB Group Intellectual Property Box 9090 650 09 Karlstad / SE | Application number, filing date | 15792610.6 | 12.05.2015 | [2017/12] | WO2015IB53474 | Priority number, date | SE20140050555 | 12.05.2014 Original published format: SE 1450555 | [2017/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015173724 | Date: | 19.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3143077 | Date: | 22.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 19.11.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C08K3/04, H05K9/00, C08J9/00, D01F9/17, C09C1/48, C01B32/05 | [2017/44] | CPC: |
C08K3/04 (EP,US);
C01B32/336 (EP);
C08J9/0066 (EP,US);
C08J9/04 (EP,US);
C09C1/48 (EP);
D01F9/17 (EP,US);
H05K9/0083 (EP,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP);
C01P2006/40 (EP);
C08J2300/22 (EP,US);
C08J2300/26 (EP,US);
C08J2323/06 (EP,US);
C08J2323/12 (EP,US);
C08J2325/06 (EP,US);
C08J2327/06 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/12] | C08K3/04, H05K9/00, C08J9/00, D01F9/17 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/12] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCH DISSIPATIVE AUFSCHÄUMBARE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT LEITFÄHIGEM KOHLENSTOFFPULVER AUSGEHEND VON LIGNIN, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2017/12] | English: | ELECTRICALLY DISSIPATIVE FOAMABLE COMPOSITION COMPRISING CONDUCTIVE CARBON POWDER EMANATING FROM LIGNIN, A METHOD FOR THE MANUFACTURING THEREOF AND USE THEREOF | [2017/12] | French: | COMPOSITION EXPANSIBLE À DISSIPATION ÉLECTRIQUE COMPRENANT DE LA POUDRE DE CARBONE CONDUCTRICE ÉMANANT DE LA LIGNINE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ET SON UTILISATION | [2017/12] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2016 | Search fee paid | 12.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/12] | 01.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/43] | 06.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2014021416 (OGUNI KOHEI [JP], et al) [I] 1-13* paragraphs [0003] , [00 8] , [0 15] - [0037] - [0 43] * | International search | [A]US3461082 (OTANI SUGIO, et al) [A] 1-19 * ; column 3, line 51 - line 62; claim 1 *; | [A]US4818437 (WILEY ROBERT E [US]) [A] 1-19 * ; column 8, line 3 - line 15; claims 15, 20-22 *; | [A]US4931479 (MORGAN NOREDIN H [US]) [A] 1-19 * ; claim 1 *; | [A]US2003213939 (NARAYAN SUJATHA [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * ; paragraphs [0019]-[0021]; claims 1, 9-10 *; | [Y]US7049362 (KAKEGAWA HIROYA [JP]) [Y] 1-19 * ; column 6, line 55 - column 7, line 11; claim 1 *; | [A]US2008242768 (NISHIHATA NAOMITSU [JP]) [A] 1-19 * ; paragraphs [0045]-[0047]; claim 1 *; | [A]JP2009283926 (TWO ONE KK) [A] 1-19* ; WPI abstract; Original document: claims 1-5, [0022], [0036] *; | [Y]JP2010242248 (TEIJIN LTD, et al) [Y] 1-19 * ; WPI abstract; Original document: claim 1, [0003], [0055] *; | [A]US2011147675 (KRAUSE JENS [FR], et al) [A] 1-19 * ; claims 9-11, 14-15 *; | [A]US2011318569 (KOBAYASHI TETSUROU [JP], et al) [A] 1-19 * ; paragraph [0002]; claims 1, 6-7 *; | [X]US2012269715 (KAMEGAWA KATSUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1-19 * ; paragraphs [0002]-[0004], [0020]-[0021], [0082], [0089]-[0094]; claim 1 *; | [Y] - SNOWDON, M.R. et al., "A study of carbonized lignin as an alternative to carbon black", Från: ACS Sustainable Chemistry and Engineering, (20140410), vol. 2, no. 5, ISSN 2168-0485, pages 1257 - 1263, XP055236197 [Y] 1-19 * ; Abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/sc500086v |