EP3213263 - HYBRID ANTI-COUNTERFEIT LABEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WISekey Semiconductors Rue de la Carrière de Bachasson Arteparc de Bachasson - Bât. A 13590 Meyreuil / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/36] | For all designated states WISeKey Semiconductors Rue de la Carrière de Bachasson Arteparc de Bachasson - Bât. A 13590 Meyreuil / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOIRON, Ghislain 6 Rue Abbe de l'Epee Bat 7 Residence Chateau Double F-13090 Aix en Provence / FR | 02 /
PIC, Pierre Chemin Pelangari F-13600 Ceyreste / FR | [2019/38] |
Former [2017/36] | 01 /
BOIRON, Ghislain E103 Val de l'Arc 2 15 Rue Henri Moissan F-13100 Aix en Provence / FR | ||
02 /
PIC, Pierre Chemin Pelangari F-13600 Ceyreste / FR | Representative(s) | de Jong, Jean Jacques, et al Omnipat 610 Chemin de Fabrègues 13510 Éguilles / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/36] | de Jong, Jean Jacques, et al Omnipat 24, place des Martyrs de la Résistance 13100 Aix en Provence / FR | Application number, filing date | 15793879.6 | 20.10.2015 | [2017/36] | WO2015FR52813 | Priority number, date | FR20140060363 | 28.10.2014 Original published format: FR 1460363 | [2017/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016066925 | Date: | 06.05.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3213263 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3213263 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077 | [2017/36] | CPC: |
G06K19/07798 (EP);
G06K19/07726 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYBRIDES FÄLSCHUNGSSICHERES ETIKETT | [2017/36] | English: | HYBRID ANTI-COUNTERFEIT LABEL | [2017/36] | French: | ETIQUETTE ANTI-CONTREFAÇON HYBRIDE | [2017/36] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/36] | 27.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.10.2015 | AL | 18.09.2019 | AT | 18.09.2019 | CY | 18.09.2019 | CZ | 18.09.2019 | DK | 18.09.2019 | EE | 18.09.2019 | ES | 18.09.2019 | FI | 18.09.2019 | HR | 18.09.2019 | IT | 18.09.2019 | LT | 18.09.2019 | LV | 18.09.2019 | MC | 18.09.2019 | MK | 18.09.2019 | MT | 18.09.2019 | NL | 18.09.2019 | PL | 18.09.2019 | RO | 18.09.2019 | RS | 18.09.2019 | SE | 18.09.2019 | SI | 18.09.2019 | SK | 18.09.2019 | SM | 18.09.2019 | TR | 18.09.2019 | IE | 20.10.2019 | LU | 20.10.2019 | BE | 31.10.2019 | BG | 18.12.2019 | NO | 18.12.2019 | GR | 19.12.2019 | IS | 19.01.2020 | PT | 20.01.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 20.10.2015 | |
AL | 18.09.2019 | ||
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CY | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
MT | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
TR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IE | 20.10.2019 | ||
LU | 20.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 20.10.2015 | |
AL | 18.09.2019 | ||
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CY | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
MT | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
IE | 20.10.2019 | ||
LU | 20.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 20.10.2015 | |
AL | 18.09.2019 | ||
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CY | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
IE | 20.10.2019 | ||
LU | 20.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CY | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
IE | 20.10.2019 | ||
LU | 20.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
IE | 20.10.2019 | ||
LU | 20.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
LU | 20.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
LU | 20.10.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
LU | 20.10.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 18.09.2019 | |
NO | 18.12.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2007293797 (IC BRAINS CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0019] - [0024] - [0031] - [0034]; figure - *; | [A]WO2004057519 (NAGRACARD SA [CH], et al) [A] 1-7 * page 3, line 19 - line 30 * * page 4, line 27 - page 5, line 16; figure - * | Examination | DE102008054711 | by applicant | US7898422 |